FRANKLIN v. POTTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01205-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH A. FRANKLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PATRICK HENRY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Ethelbert Patrick +1 703 256 7754 +1 703 256 7883 rpatrick@patrickhenry.net
v.
No Logo JOHN POTTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/3/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
MOTION for Extension of Time to file its Motion for Summary Judgment by JOHN POTTER (Natiello, Christian)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/27/2008. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/29/2008. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/20/2008. (gdf)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
      MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's summary judgment motion is due on August 27, 2008; plaintiff's opposition is due on September 29, 2008; and defendant's reply is due on October 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 18, 2008. (lcesh2)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by JOHN POTTER (Natiello, Christian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Substitution of Counsel
          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of JOHN POTTER Substituting for attorney John Interrante (Natiello, Christian)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery shall be completed by 5/13/2008. The parties shall provide initial disclosures by 12/20/2007. Plaintiff's expert reports are due by 1/22/2008. Defendant's expert reports are due by 2/20/2008. Dispositive motions shall by filed by 7/14/2008; oppositions by 8/25/2008; and replies, if any, by 9/15/2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 20, 2007. (lcesh1)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Meet and Confer Hearing
              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle : Meet and Confer Hearing held on 11/20/2007.Discovery due by 5/13/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2008.,Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2008.,Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2008.,Plaintiff Rule 26a1 due by 12/20/2007.,Defendant Rule 26a1 due by 12/20/2007.,Plaintiff Rule 26a2 due by 1/22/2008.,Defendant Rule 26a2 due by 2/20/2008. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (gdf, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Defendant's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time for Parties to File Joint Rule 16.3 Report and to Reschedule November 13, 2007 Initial Status Conference. The parties shall file their joint Rule 16.3 Report on or before November 13, 2007. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for November 13, 2007, is hereby VACATED and RESET for November 20, 2007, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/8/2007. (KF)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 16.3 Report, MOTION to Continue Initial Status Conference by JOHN POTTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL - Attorney John G. Interrante for JOHN POTTER added. Substituting for attorney Alan Burch. (nmw, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                          Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2007 11:45 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2007 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 14. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/23/2007. (lcesh2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Answer
                              ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN POTTER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JOSEPH A. FRANKLIN.(Burch, Alan)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to complaint due by 10/23/2007. (gdf)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007, Terminated: 10/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by JOHN POTTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [4] Defendant's First Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the complaint on or before October 23, 2007. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/9/2007. (KF)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of JOHN POTTER (Burch, Alan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 08/08/07., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JOHN POTTER served on 8/8/2007, answer due 10/9/2007., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 8/8/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT against JOHN POTTER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616005253) filed by JOSEPH A. FRANKLIN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Summons Issued
                                            Summons (3) Issued as to JOHN POTTER., SUMMONS Issued as to JOHN POTTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?