HUNTER v. RICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01268-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DONALD S. HUNTER, SR., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo CONDELEEZA RICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/17/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-00857-PLF
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Motion for Protective Order
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by CONDELEEZA RICE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Momeni, Mercedeh)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
    AMENDED COMPLAINT against CONDELEEZA RICE filed by DONALD S. HUNTER, SR. ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman)(Received by Case Administrator on 9/2/08)(td, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER that the two claims in plaintiff's complaint arising from non-selections or failure-to-promote are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 14, 2008. (MA)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 14, 2008. (MA)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
          Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2008. Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) due by 6/3/2008. Plaintiff's Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(B) due by 8/29/2008. Defendant's disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(B) due by 9/30/2008. Discovery to be completed by 10/31/2008. Status Conference set for 11/6/2008 @ 09:15 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2008. Responses to Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2009. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2009. (mm)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Status Conference
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 5/14/2008. Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) due by 6/3/2008. Discovery to be completed by 10/31/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2008. Responses to Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2009. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2009. Status Conference set for 11/6/2008 @ 09:15 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
              Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/14/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Order
                MINUTE ORDER that the status conference scheduled for May 14, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. is rescheduled to 9:00 a.m. the same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2008. (MA)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of CONDELEEZA RICE Substituting for attorney Karen Melnik (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Meet and Confer Hearing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Meet and Confer Status Conference held on 2/5/2008. Parties agreed to stay case until next Status Conference. Next Status Conference set for 5/14/2008 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm) Modified on 2/6/2008 (mm).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Melnik, Karen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served 10/24/07; answer due 12/23/2007 (td, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Order
                          MINUTE ORDER: In light of the defendant's filing of an Answer, the Court's Order dated December 21, 2007 is VACATED. A Meet and Confer Status Conference is set for 2/5/2008 @ 09:45 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman.The parties shall meet, confer and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 1/29/2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/11/2008. (mm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 10/24/2007, answer due 12/23/2007 (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                              VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED 1/11/2008.....ORDER that plaintiff shall effect service of process in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 21, 2007. (MA) Modified on 1/11/2008 (mm).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint by CONDELEEZA RICE. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by DONALD S. HUNTER, SR..(Melnik, Karen)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Melnik on behalf of CONDELEEZA RICE (Melnik, Karen)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file proof of service or a Status Report advising why service has not been made by 1/15/2008. (mm)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/16/07. (jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/16/07., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CONDELEEZA RICE served on 10/16/2007, answer due 12/17/2007. (td, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Summons Issued
                                          Summons Issued (3) as to SUMMONS Issued as to CONDELEEZA RICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mmh, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Notice of Related Case
                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DONALD S. HUNTER, SR. Case related to Case No. 06-326 PLF, 04-857 PLF. (td, ) Modified on 7/30/2007 (lc, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against CONDELEEZA RICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616005575) filed by DONALD S. HUNTER, SR. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2007 (td, ). Modified on 7/30/2007 (lc, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Summons Not Issued
                                                SUMMONS Not Issued as to CONDELEEZA RICE (td, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?