Interrupt Mask Disable Circuit And Method
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08346834
Examiner Gopal C Ray, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bowles, James E., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenkens & Gilchrist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK R. ANDERSON +1 312 658 6500
Space Cynthia Barnett +1 574 372 7332
Space Timothy Brown +1 214 842 6829
Space DANIEL J. BURNHAM. +1 312 425 8513
Space Richard Butler +1 408 446 1418
Space Sorinel Cimpoes +1 312 425 3900
Space JANET M. GARETTO. +1 312 425 3900
Space John G. Gatz +1 312 425 3900
Space Russell J. Genet +1 312 425 3900 +1 312 425 3909 rgenet@nixonpeabody.com
Space Anil Gollahalli +1 405 325 4124
Space
Space Steven R. Greenfield +1 972 680 6058
Space John Heptig +1 214 451 2154
Space Gerald Hrycyszyn +1 617 646 8313
Space Sharon Audrey Israel +1 713 546 0575 +1 713 632 1807 sisrael@mayerbrownrowe.com
Space Paul Richard Kitch +1 312 425 3900 pkitch@nixonpeabody.com
Space MICHAEL W. MADDOX +1 214 564 5563
Space Lisa Meyerhoff +1 713 427 5000
Space Ashley Moore +1 214 978 6337
Space
Space Ross Robinson +1 214 745 5185
Space Stephen Rudisill +1 312 425 8570
Space Jerry R Selinger +1 214 855 4500
Space Amy L. Sierocki +1 213 629 6000
Space Justin D. Swindells +1 312 425 8534 jswindells@nixonpeabody.com
Space Andre Szuwalski +1 214 999 4795
Space Katherine Tabor +1 312 401 8101
Space HAROLD N. WELLS +1 312 857 2336
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Bowles, James E., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date November 30, 1994
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 069400032C
Confirmation Number 3503
Group Art Unit 2305
Class / Sub-Class 395 / 735
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Assignments (10) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - RXOGNOTC
Notice of Reexam Published in Official Gazette (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
    Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
      Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
        Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
          Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
            Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
              Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                  Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Issue Notification Mailed
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - N271
                      Response to Amendment under Rule 312 (1 Page)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Response to Amendment under Rule 312
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                  Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                    Drawings-only black and white line drawings (5 Pages)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
                                      Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
                                        Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                                          Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Issue Fee Payment Verified
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
                                                Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (1 Page)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                                  Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (2 Pages)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Mail Notice of Allowance
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                          Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Supplemental Response
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
                                                                      Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                        Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                          Claims (5 Pages)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                            Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/27/1995, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                      Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                        Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                          Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
                                                                                            Change of Address (1 Page)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
                                                                                                Abandonment (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Application Captured on Microfilm
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                      Claims (2 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                        Specification (2 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                          Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                  Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                    Transmittal of New Application (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                      Extension of Time (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
                                                                                                                        Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                          Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                            Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                              Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
                                                                                                                                Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                  Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                      Claims (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                        Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                            Claims (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                Extension of Time (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                  Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                    List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                      List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                        Final Rejection (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                          Examiner's search strategy and results (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                            Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                              Extension of Time (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
                                                                                                                                                                Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                  Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                    Claims (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                      Specification (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Formal Drawings Required (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/1993, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                  List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Examiner's search strategy and results (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/1993, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                                                        Power of Attorney (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                            Drawings-only black and white line drawings (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                              Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Specification (16 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Specification (16 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Drawings-only black and white line drawings (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Bibliographic Data Sheet (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/1992, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?