BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN v. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01421-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Interim General Counsel, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN"

Toggle Switch Represented by 1025 Connecticut Avenue, NW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Stephen Wolly +1 202 857 5000 +1 202 223 8417 mwolly@zwerdling.com
v.
No Logo National Mediation Board, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Union Pacific Railroad Company Union Pacific Railroad Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford Alan Godiner +1 314 552 6433 +1 314 552 7433 cgodiner@thompsoncoburn.com
Space Harvey A. Levin +1 202 585 6900 +1 202 585 6969 hlevin@thompsoncoburn.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/6/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 740 - Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause Section 45 U.S.C. § 151 Railway Labor Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 11/2/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-K
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN (Wolly, Michael)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007, Terminated: 9/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
    MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion for Additional Time)(Levin, Harvey)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Union Pacific shall respond to the complaint on or before November 14, 2007 (jwd)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
        MINUTE ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Union Pacific shall respond to the complaint on or before November 14, 2007. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 09/12/07. (dbk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before November 14, 2007 (jwd)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
            MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for National Mediation Board. Defendant shall respond on or before November 14, 2007. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 09/11/07. (dbk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 9/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on September 6, 2007 granting [6] Motion for Leave of Clifford Alan Godiner,:Firm- Thompson Coburn LLP, :Address- One US Bank Plaza. Phone No. - 314 552-6433. Fax No. - 202-552-7433 by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY to Appear Pro Hac Vice (jwd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007, Terminated: 9/6/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clifford Alan Godiner, :Firm- Thompson Coburn LLP, :Address- One US Bank Plaza. Phone No. - 314 552-6433. Fax No. - 202-552-7433 by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clifford A. Godiner as Co-Counsel for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company)(Levin, Harvey)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                    STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/4/7. (dbk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Union Pacific shall file an answer/response to the complaint on or before October 4, 2007 (jwd)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                        MINUTE ORDER granting [2] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Union Pacific shall file an answer/response to the complaint on or before October 4, 2007. The parties are directed to the court's civil standing order posted today. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/5/07. (dbk) Modified on 9/6/2007 (nmw, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Response to any document
                          RESPONSE to [2] Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion for Additional Time filed by BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN. (Wolly, Michael) Modified on 9/5/2007 (nmw, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford A. Godiner on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Levin, Harvey) Modified on 9/5/2007 (nmw, ). Modified on 9/5/2007 (nmw, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion for Additional Time)(Levin, Harvey)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616006002) filed by BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                  SUMMONS (4) Issued as to NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?