WILLIAMS v. WALKER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01452-JDB
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIANE R. WILLIAMS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo DAVID M. WALKER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie Lisa Glickson +1 410 209 4836 melanie.glickson@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/10/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID M. WALKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exh. 10, # (11) Exh. 11, # (12) Exh. 12, # (13) Exh. 13, # (14) Exh. 14)(Glickson, Melanie)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply brief due by 5/27/2008. (CK)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [10] defendant's consent motion for an extension of time to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's reply brief shall be filed by not later than May 27, 2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/12/2008. (CK)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/11/2008, Entered: 5/11/2008, Terminated: 5/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DAVID M. WALKER (Glickson, Melanie)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply brief due by 5/12/2008. (CK)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
            MINUATE ORDER: Upon consideration of [9] defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply in support of dispositive motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's reply shall be filed by not later than May 12, 2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/6/2008. (CK)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008, Terminated: 5/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DAVID M. WALKER (Glickson, Melanie)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply brief due by 5/2/2008. (CK)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                  MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [8] defendant's consent motion for an extension of time to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's reply brief shall be filed by not later than May 2, 2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/31/2008. (CK)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DAVID M. WALKER (Glickson, Melanie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                      Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [4] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by DIANE R. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Diane Williams, # (2) Exhibit Affidavit of Janice Reece, # (3) Statement of Genuine Issues, # (4) Text of Proposed Order, # (5) Affidavit Rule 56(f) Affidavit)(Kator, Michael)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to defendant's dispositive motion due by 3/24/2008. (CK)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                          MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [6] plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time to file opposition to defendant's dispositive motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file her opposition brief by not later than March 24, 2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/25/2008. (CK)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008, Terminated: 2/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [4] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by DIANE R. WILLIAMS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kator, Michael)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment (in the alternative) by DAVID M. WALKER (See Docket Entry [4] to view document) (lc, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by DAVID M. WALKER (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # (3) Exh. 1, # (4) Exh. 2, # (5) Exh. 3, # (6) Exh. 4, # (7) Exh. 5, # (8) Exh. 6, # (9) Exh. 7, # (10) Exh. 8, # (11) Exh. 9, # (12) Exh. 10, # (13) Text of Proposed Order Exh. 11)(Glickson, Melanie)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to complaint due 2/11/2008. (CK)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                    MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [3] defendant's consent motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed by not later than February 11, 2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/31/2008. (CK)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008, Terminated: 1/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (1 week) by DAVID M. WALKER (Glickson, Melanie)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to complaint due by 2/4/2008. (CK)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                          MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [2] defendant's consent motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed by not later than February 4, 2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/6/2007. (CK)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint (60 days) by DAVID M. WALKER (Glickson, Melanie)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against DAVID M. WALKER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616006115) filed by DIANE R. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DAVID M. WALKER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?