HARRISON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01543-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 1:40 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON, Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/30/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment due by 9/8/2008. (mm)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
    MINUTE ORDER granting [26] plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time up to and including September 8, 2008 to file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2008. (MA)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Notice of Change of Address
      NOTICE of Change of Address by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON; (See Docket Entry No. [26] to view document) (td, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [20] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON (td, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2008: # (1) Exhibit Copy of Envelope with New Address) (td, ).
          LREF
          Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE of Change of Address by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON (td, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss or for summary judgment due by 9/12/2008. (mm)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
              MINUTE ORDER granting [23] plaintiff's motion for extension of time up to and including September 12, 2008 to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 5, 2008.(MA)
                LREF
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Civil StatementCourt Filing
                Civil Statement from Plaintiff; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond/Oppose by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Service by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Owens, Cindy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER that plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than August 23, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 3, 2008. (MA)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 8/23/2008. (mm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS Substituting for attorney John G. Interrante (Owens, Cindy)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON (td, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [13] plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint a second time; granting [16] defendant's motion for extension of time to answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 16, 2008. (MA)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 5/29/2008. (mm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/29/2008. (mm)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, [9] Amended Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Interrante, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Further Amend And/or Supplement His Previously-filed Complaints and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to All Complaints) filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/14/2008. Response to plaintiff's motion for leave to further amend prior pleading due by 4/14/2008. (mm)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                            MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants motion [14] for an extension of time. The defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, amended complaint and plaintiffs motion for leave to further amended the prior pleading by April 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 3, 2008. (MA)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Amended Complaint and First Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Further Amend his Previously-Filed Complaints by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                MOTION to Amend/supplemental pursuant to Rules 15(a) & (d) by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/29/2008. (mm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to the complaint on or before February 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/2/08. (lcplf1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007, Terminated: 1/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to Federal Bureau of Prisons answer due 12/31/2007 (td, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 10/31/2007, answer due 12/31/2007 (td, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON. ("Let this be filed" Judge Friedman 11/26/07)(td, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Interrante on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Interrante, John)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/22/07. (td, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                    Case Reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (td, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of William Henry Harrison and granting [2] in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/27/07. (td, ) Modified on 10/10/2007 (td, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1), the claims brought under the FOIA and the Privacy Act are DISMISSED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall randomly assign this case to a district judge as brought pursuant to the Administrative Act, 5 U.S.C. 702.. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/27/07. (td, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner StatementCourt Filing
                                                                          PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/16/07. (ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2007 (td, ).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007, Terminated: 8/30/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON (ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2007 (td, ).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAI OF PRISONS filed by WILLIAM HENRY HARRISON.(ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2007 (td, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Summons Not Issued
                                                                                SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAI OF PRISONS (ls, )
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?