YATES v. BREYER et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01549-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAN YATES, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ERIK FOSSUM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEPHEN G. BREYER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo WILLIAM K. SUTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/30/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 3/20/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-L
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
MINUTE ORDER terminating [4] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 4/2/08. (lcrmu2)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DAN YATES (jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
      STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/21/07. (lcrmu2)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
        Set Deadlines/Hearings: plaintiff's response to the defendants' motion to dismiss is due on or before Thursday, March 20, 2008 (jwd)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
          MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ordered that the plaintiff's response to the defendants' motion to dismiss is due on or before Thursday, March 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/21/07. (lcrmu2)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by DAN YATES (tg, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry [5] Errata was entered in error and the certificate of service was added to Docket entry [4]. (nmw, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 ERRATA
                ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA Certificate of Service by STEPHEN G. BREYER, WILLIAM K. SUTER, ERIK FOSSUM [4] MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, and proposed Order filed by STEPHEN G. BREYER, ERIK FOSSUM, WILLIAM K. SUTER. (Kidwell, Judith) Modified on 11/28/2007 (nmw, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007, Terminated: 4/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, and proposed Order by STEPHEN G. BREYER, WILLIAM K. SUTER, ERIK FOSSUM (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit 1-4)(Kidwell, Judith) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2007 (nmw, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 11/27/2007. (jwd)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [3] the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ordered that the defendants' response to the plaintiff's complaint is due on or before Tuesday, November 27, 2007. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 11/15/07. (lcrmu2)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 11/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Complaint by STEPHEN G. BREYER, WILLIAM K. SUTER, ERIK FOSSUM (Kidwell, Judith)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of all defendants (Kidwell, Judith)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against STEPHEN G. BREYER, WILLIAM K. SUTER, ERIK FOSSUM ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616006546) filed by DAN YATES. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                              SUMMONS (5) Issued as to STEPHEN G. BREYER, WILLIAM K. SUTER, ERIK FOSSUM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?