WIESNER v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01599-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARTIN WIESNER, Plaintiff
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-NP, TYPE-I
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 ERRATA
ERRATA Corrected Certificate of Service by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY [29] Notice of Appearance filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Owens, Cindy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Response to Document
      RESPONSE (statement of material facts) re [20] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment filed by MARTIN WIESNER. (td, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Statement of material facts in genuine dispute in conformance with Local Rule 7(h) due by 4/7/2008. (mpt, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER re [21] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. The plaintiff shall file his statement of material facts in genuine dispute in conformance with Local Civil Rule 7(h), if any he intends to file, on or before April 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/07/08. (lcrbw3, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
            REPLY to opposition to motion re [20] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit)(Interrante, John)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: ReplY memorandum in support of motion to dismiss or for summary judgment due on or before 3/4/2008. (mpt, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                MINUTE ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court having reviewed the Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply, and it appearing to the Court that there is good cause to grant the relief requested therein, it is ORDERED that the Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall file its reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss or for summary judgment, if any, on or before March 4, 2008. It is further ORDERED that no further extensions of time shall be granted with respect to the reply memorandum described above absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/20/08. (lcrbw3, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply memorandum in support of motion to dismiss due by 2/19/2008. (mpt, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court having reviewed the Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply, and it appearing to the Court that there is good cause to grant the relief requested therein (provided, however, that the Court is willing to grant such relief in large part because of the Federal Bureau of Investigation's representation that it will not need to seek any further extensions of time with respect to its reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss or for summary judgment), it is ORDERED that the Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall file its reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss or for summary judgment on or before February 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/30/08. (lcrbw3, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply memorandum in support of motion for summary judgement due by 1/29/2008. (mpt, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Based upon the representations made by the Federal Bureau of Investigation in its motion for extension of time in which to file a reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss or for summary judgment, it is ORDERED that the Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall file its reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss or for summary judgment on or before January 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/23/08. (lcrbw3, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 1/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                Memorandum in opposition to re [20] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment, [21] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARTIN WIESNER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (See Docket Entry [20] to view document) (jf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) Modified on 12/26/2007 (jf, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by MARTIN WIESNER.(Interrante, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court having reviewed the Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, and it appearing to the Court that there is good cause to grant the relief requested therein, it is ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/27/07. (lcrbw3, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [17] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint filed by MARTIN WIESNER. (td, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint re [1] Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (jf, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                                              NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by John G. Interrante on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Madelyn E. Johnson (Interrante, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                MINUTE ORDER finding as moot [14] Motion to Strike. In light of the Court's order entered on November 7, 2007, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion to Strike U.S. Attorney's Answer is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/09/07. (lcrbw3, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or responsive motion is due by 11/21/2007. (mpt, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [10] Motion to Set Aside Default. The defaults entered by the Clerk of the Court on October 23, 2007, are vacated. The defendants shall file their answer or responsive motions in this case on or before November 21, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/07/07. (lcrbw3, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of filing of opposition to motion to set aside entry of default by MARTIN WIESNER (td, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                        MOTION to Strike U.S. Attorney's Answer [10] by MARTIN WIESNER (td, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 ERRATA
                                                          ERRATA by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY [10] MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE re [10] MOTION to Set Aside Default; (Counsel has been notified that the order attached to document no. 10 is incorrect and an Errata needs to be filed.) (td, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [10] MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by MARTIN WIESNER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B); (NOTE: The Clerk's Office only received exhibit B as an attachment)(td, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Summons Reissued as to AUSA
                                                                SUMMONS REISSUED (1) to, and non-party U.S. Attorney. (jf)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007, Terminated: 11/7/2007 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                  MOTION to Set Aside Default by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Letter Dated October 23, 2007)(Johnson, Madelyn)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                    VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 11/7/07.....Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (td, ) Modified on 11/30/2007 (ks, ).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                      VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 11/7/07.....Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (td, ) Modified on 11/30/2007 (ks, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Affidavit for Default
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against defendant Central Intelligence Agency by MARTIN WIESNER. (td, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Affidavit for Default
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation by MARTIN WIESNER. (td, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 10/3/2007, answer due 12/3/2007. (td, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 9/17/2007, answer due 11/16/2007. (td, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 9/17/2007, answer due 11/16/2007. (td, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 9/17/07. (td, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616006723) filed by MARTIN WIESNER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                      SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?