Gas Chromatograph Flow Calibrator
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08368491
Examiner Robert R Raevis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Haskell, Weston W., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by LARRY MASON LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Lee +1 512 346 1277
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Haskell, Weston W, Fulshear, TX (US)
Filing Date January 1, 1995
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 93-1006
Confirmation Number 9405
Group Art Unit 2212
Class / Sub-Class 73 / 1
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
    Issue Notification Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Fee Payment Verified
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
        Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
          Mail Notice of Allowance
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 12/2/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
            Date Forwarded to Examiner
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
              Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                Response after Non-Final Action
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Non-Final Rejection
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Application Captured on Microfilm
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Application Is Now Complete
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?