CRUZ-JIMENEZ v. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01690-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ, Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
No Logo INS/OFFICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
No Logo P. GARCIA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/24/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 7/28/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION re [15, 16] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/24/2008. (VT)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [15] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/24/2008. (VT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in opposition to re [15] MOTION to Dismiss, [16] MOTION to Transfer Case filed by RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(jf, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 6/11/2008, Response due by 7/14/2008 (gdf)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss complaint or, in the alternative, to transfer no later than July 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/12/2008. (VT)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
            MOTION to Transfer Case by U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY. (See Docket Entry [15] to view document) (jf, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008, Terminated: 7/24/2008 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss by U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                MINUTE ORDER granting [14] Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their response on or before June 11, 2008. No further continuances will be granted. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/10/2008. (VT)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set Deadlines: Answer due by 6/9/2008. (tj, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiff's complaint on or before June 9, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/28/2008. (VT)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ (jf, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [11] Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiff's complaint on or before May 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/28/2008. (VT)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/28/2008. (gdf)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiff's complaint on or before April 28, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/7/2008. (VT)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 1/7/2008, answer due 3/7/2008, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY served on 1/7/2008, answer due 3/7/2008. (tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 1/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/21/07., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE served on 12/19/2007, answer due 2/19/2008; P. GARCIA served on 12/19/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (jf, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                            SUMMONS (6) Issued as to U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle from Unassigned. (tg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ. Plaintiff is obligated to pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.09 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Plaintiff is obligated to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia for twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account as continued partial payments on the remaining balance of the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/26/07. (tg, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Response to Order of the Court
                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [3] Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ. (tg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner StatementCourt Filing
                                                    PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/14/07. (ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2007 (tg, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ (ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2007 (tg, ).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY filed by RAFAEL DANIEL DE LA CRUZ-JIMENEZ. ATTACHMENTS(ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2007 (tg, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Summons Not Issued
                                                          SUMMONS Not Issued as to U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INS/OFFICE, P. GARCIA, FEDERL BUREAU OF PRISONS AGENCY (ls, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?