BROWN v. TURRI
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01791-JDB
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLISON J. BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr & Allison PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore S. Allison +1 202 331 7600 +1 202 293 3999 tsallison@karrallison.com
v.
No Logo ROBERT C. TAPELLA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/4/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $60000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 10/6/2008, at 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 09/05/08. (DM)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/31/2008. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/1/2008. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/15/2008. (tb, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for mediation and settlement discussions for a sixty (60) day period. (kb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER with referral to Magistrate Judge Kay for a period of sixty (60) days for mediation and facilitation of settlement discussions. See text of the Order for additional details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/2/08. (lcjdb1)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Status Conference
          Minute Entry Status Conference held on 9/2/2008 before Judge John D. Bates: Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/27/2008, Entered: 7/27/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
            REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Determine Jurisdiction filed by ALLISON J. BROWN. (Allison, Theodore)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
              Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION to Determine Jurisdiction filed by ROBERT C. TAPELLA, WILLIAM H. TURRI. (Natiello, Christian)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION to Determine Jurisdiction by ALLISON J. BROWN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Theodore)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/29/2008. Status Conference set for 9/2/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. (lcjdb1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                    MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [7] plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time to complete discovery, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall have until 8/29/08 to complete discovery in this matter. And it is further ORDERED that the status conference initially set for 7/15/08 will now take place on 9/2/08 at 9:00 a.m. So ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/10/08. (lcjdb1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ALLISON J. BROWN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Theodore)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of ROBERT C. TAPELLA Substituting for attorney W. Mark Nebeker (Natiello, Christian)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Rule 26a1 disclosures due by 2/19/2008. Plaintiff's Rule 26a1 disclosures due by 2/19/2008. Plaintiff's Rule 26a2 report due by 3/16/2008. Defendant's Rule26a2 report due within 60 days of service of plaintiff's report. Discovery shall be completed by 7/14/2008. Status Conference set for 7/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. Dispositive Motions due by not later than 9/12/2008. See text of the Order for more details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/16/08. (lcjdb1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Status Conference
                            Minute Entry. Status Conference held on 1/16/2008 before Judge John D. Bates: Status Conference set for 7/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates.. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                              MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2008 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. See text of Order for more details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/18/07. (lcjdb1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by WILLIAM H. TURRI. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by ALLISON J. BROWN.(Nebeker, William)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against WILLIAM H. TURRI ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616007351) filed by ALLISON J. BROWN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                      SUMMONS (3) Issued as to WILLIAM H. TURRI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?