GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY v. HIRSCH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01804-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Represented by Kornstein Veisz & Wexler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T. McTaggart +1 212 418 8600 +1 212 826 3640 dmctaggart@kvwmail.com
Space William B. Pollard, III +1 212 418 8600 wpollard@kvwmail.com

Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Sarah Gere +1 202 662 2000 egere@rdblaw.com
Space Karen Ventrell +1 202 662 2000 kventrell@rdblaw.com
No Logo CAROL HIRSCH, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

No Logo JOEL HIRSCH, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

v.
No Logo CAROL HIRSCH, Defendant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

No Logo JOEL HIRSCH, Defendant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

No Logo GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Represented by Kornstein Veisz & Wexler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T. McTaggart +1 212 418 8600 +1 212 826 3640 dmctaggart@kvwmail.com
Space William B. Pollard, III +1 212 418 8600 wpollard@kvwmail.com

Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Sarah Gere +1 202 662 2000 egere@rdblaw.com
Space Karen Ventrell +1 202 662 2000 kventrell@rdblaw.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/5/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, JURY, STAYED, TYPE-M
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MINUTE ORDER granting [31][32]Motion for Protective Order. The Court adopts the terms of the consent protective order proposed by the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 26, 2008. (lcegs2)
    LREF
    Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Joint MOTION Of The Parties Regarding Confidentiality Order by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Masters, Lorelie)
      LREF
      Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION Regarding Confidentiality Order by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Apfel, Carrie)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/5/2008 (clv, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2008, Entered: 8/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
          MINUTE ORDER granting [28] [30] Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall respond to Great Northern's discovery demands by no later than September 5, 2008. Further requests for extensions of time shall be viewed with disfavor. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 2, 2008.(lcegs2)
            LREF
            Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008, Terminated: 8/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [28] MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond And Reply To Discovery Demands Filed By Great Northern Insurance Co. by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Apfel, Carrie)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/11/09. (clv, ) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [28] MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond And Reply To Discovery Demands Filed By Great Northern Insurance Co. Memorandum in Partial Opposition filed by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (McTaggart, David)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (Masters, Lorelie) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008, Terminated: 8/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond And Reply To Discovery Demands Filed By Great Northern Insurance Co. by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Masters, Lorelie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Pollard, William) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Lorelie S. Masters (Masters, Lorelie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Amunson, Jessica) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                            Reply/ ANSWER to [8] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: [8] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by CAROL HIRSCH, JOEL HIRSCH.(McTaggart, David)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond And Submit To Depositions Noticed By Great Northern Insurance Co. by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Masters, Lorelie) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie F Apfel on behalf of JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Apfel, Carrie)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  RESPONSE re 41 Notice (Other) To Great Northern's Request For A Telephone Conference With The Court To Seek Permission To File A Motion For Partial Summary Judgement filed by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (Masters, Lorelie) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Order
                                    MINUTE ORDER cancelling the mediation set for July 1, 2008. Counsel are asked to contact Judge Kay's chambers after the conclusion of ENE in order to set a mutually convenient mediation date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/09/08. (DM)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Pollard, William) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER setting mediation for July 1, 2008, at 10:30 a.m., in chambers - room 2333. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/05/08. (DM)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment That D.C. Code § 15.501 Protects An Individual's Residence, Retirement Funds, And Pension Benefits From Attachment, Levy Or Seizure In Satisfaction Of Judgment by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Pollard, William) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 25, 2008. (lcegs2)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment That D.C. Code § 15.501 Protects An Individual's Residence, Retirement Funds, And Pension Benefits From Attachment, Levy Or Seizure In Satisfaction Of Judgment by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Masters, Lorelie) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Case Stayed
                                                Case Stayed until 6/25/08 (clv, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH re 35 MOTION For Partial Summary Judgment that D.C. Code 15.501 Protects an Individual's Residence, Retirement Funds, and Pension Benefits From Attachment, Levy or Seizure in Satisfaction of Judgment (Masters, Lorelie) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 3/16/2008. Defendant Rule 26a1 due by 7/9/2008. Plaintiff Rule 26a1 due by 7/9/2008. Defendant Rule 26a2 due by 11/10/2008. Plaintiff Rule 26a2 due by 11/10/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2008. Status Conference set for 3/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 33 MOTION to Compel Disclosure filed by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Pollard, William) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 6/25/2008. (clv, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 33 MOTION to Compel Disclosure filed by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (Masters, Lorelie) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MINUTE ORDER denying [14] Motion to Dismiss; denying [16] Motion to Compel. This case is referred to the Circuit Executive Mediation Program for a neutral case evaluation to take place no later than June 25, 2008. All other proceedings in this case are stayed until June 25, 2008. Defendants' initial disclosures shall be made no later than July 9, 2008 and Defendants' outstanding discovery requests shall be completed by August 8, 2008. Fact and Expert discovery shall conclude no later than March 16, 2009. Additional discovery deadlines are detailed in the Scheduling Order issued this day. A status hearing will be held on March 19, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 25, 2008. (lcegs2)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION For Partial Summary Judgment that D.C. Code 15.501 Protects an Individual's Residence, Retirement Funds, and Pension Benefits From Attachment, Levy or Seizure in Satisfaction of Judgment by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement. (mmh, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Great Northern Insurance Co. by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Status Conference
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 4/24/2008, Status Conference set for 2/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. OTBP (Court Reporter WENDY RICARD.) (clv, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Compel Disclosure by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McTaggart, David) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/24/2008 12:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Order
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a status hearing in this case for April 24, 2008 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 10, 2008. (lcegs2)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                            MOTION to Stay Discovery by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [21]Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Court grants defendants' motion to stay discovery until that motion is resolved. Accordingly, all discovery is hereby STAYED. The Court will issue a scheduling order for discovery upon the resolution of the motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that defendant's motion for attorney's fees is denied. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 7, 2008. (lcegs2)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Dan Jaeger, # (2) Exhibit A to Jaeger Reply Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit B to Jaeger Reply Affidavit, # (4) Exhibit C to Jaeger Reply Affidavit, # (5) Exhibit D to Jaeger Reply Affidavit, # (6) Exhibit E to Jaeger Reply Affidavit, # (7) Exhibit F to Jaeger Reply Affidavit, # (8) Exhibit G to Jaeger Reply Affidavit)(McTaggart, David)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [16] MOTION to Compel Disclosure filed by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (McTaggart, David)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [16] MOTION to Compel Disclosure filed by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [14] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Disclosure by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(McTaggart, David)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2008. (clv, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [15] Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Joel and Carol Hirsch shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss no later than February 13, 2008. Plaintiff/ Counterclaim Defendant Great Northern shall file any reply in support of its motion no later than February 28, 2008. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 28, 2008. (lcegs2)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 1/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [14] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Affidavit of Dan Jaeger, # (3) Exhibit A (part 1), # (4) Exhibit A (part 2), # (5) Exhibit A (part 3), # (6) Exhibit A (part 4), # (7) Exhibit B)(McTaggart, David) Modified on 1/22/2008 (lc, ).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (McTaggart, David)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Pollard, III on behalf of GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Pollard, William)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/18/2008. (clv, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [11] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Counterclaim. Plaintiffs shall answer or otherwise move in response to defendants' counterclaim by no later than January 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 17, 2007. (lcegs2)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 12/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply or Otherwise Move in Response to Counterclaim by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (McTaggart, David)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 1/11/2008.,Meet & Confer Statement due by 1/18/2008. Setting forth further instruction to counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/29/07. (clv, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Ventrell on behalf of GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Ventrell, Karen)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY by JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.(Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/28/2007. (clv, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [7] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response to plaintiff's complaint shall be filed no later than November 28, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 2, 2007. (lcegs2)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 11/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lorelie S. Masters on behalf of JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Masters, Lorelie)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ring Amunson on behalf of JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH (Amunson, Jessica)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION (JOINT) Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Move in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Amunson, Jessica)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Order
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER striking Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Move in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The parties are directed to file a consent motion and proposed order for any requested relief. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 25, 2007. (lcegs2)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David T. McTaggart. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 12, 2007. (lcegs2)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 10/12/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David T. McTaggart, :Firm- Kornstein Veisz Wexler & Pollard, LLP, :Address- 757 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 418-8600. Fax No. - (212) 826-3640 by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (Gere, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (jf, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616007383) filed by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Summons (2) Issued as to JOEL HIRSCH, CAROL HIRSCH. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 291 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?