BANKS v. CONNER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01807-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 12, 2019 at 6:23 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DENISE A. BANKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Tom Weathered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles W. Day, Jr. +1 202 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 billday@covad.net
Space Joseph D. Gebhardt +1 202 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 jgebhardt@gebhardtlaw.com
v.
No Logo CHARLES F. CONNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013 Addy R. Schmitt +1 202 252 2530 +1 202 252 2599 aschmitt@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/18/2011 Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo ED SCHAFER, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS J. VILSACK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Hudak +1 202 514 7143 +1 202 252 2599 brian.hudak@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/22/2013 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/28/2013 Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013 Addy R. Schmitt +1 202 252 2530 +1 202 252 2599 aschmitt@milchev.com
TERMINATED: 11/26/2013 Michelle Jean Seo +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 514 8780 michelle.seo@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/02/2013 Mary Elizabeth Stratton +1 202 252 2575 +1 202 514 8780 mary.elizabeth.stratton@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/18/2011 Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas James Vilsack, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Hudak +1 202 514 7143 +1 202 252 2599 brian.hudak@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/22/2013 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/28/2013 Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013 Addy R. Schmitt +1 202 252 2530 +1 202 252 2599 aschmitt@milchev.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elizabeth Stratton +1 202 252 2575 +1 202 514 8780 mary.elizabeth.stratton@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/18/2011 Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/5/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (211) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 182 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/29/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/12/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/11/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Order Reopening Case
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. Attorney Michelle Jean Seo terminated. (Seo, Michelle) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. Attorney Mary Elizabeth Stratton terminated. (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER referring case to mediation and staying and administratively closing case through October 31, 2013; postponing sine die the October 23, 2013 motions hearing; staying sine die the briefing schedule for the defendant's motions for judgment as a matter or law and for a new trial and the plaintiff's potential motions for additional post-verdict relief; ordering the parties to file by October 31, 2013 a joint status report and proposed order. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/3/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Exhibit List (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Exhibit List (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Final Jury Instructions. (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Signature Page of Foreperson Jury Verdict. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Verdict Form. (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Signature Page of Foreperson Jury Notes (2). (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Notes (2) (hs) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Signature Page of Foreperson Jury Notes (3). (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (hs) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Notes(3) (hs) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/12/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/12/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Opposition to Motion to Strike Exhibit 12 filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Revised Chart)(Day, Charles) Modified on 8/15/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Argument in Support of the Admissibility of Subsequent Performance Appraisals filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 102 Notice (Other) (MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO AND ORAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 12) filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to (DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING THE INADMISSIBILITY OF PERFORMANCE EVALUATIONS FOR YEARS OTHER THAN FY 1999) filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by DENISE A. BANKS. (Rainey, Valencia) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Cross MOTION to Strike 104 Exhibit List (DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION TO STRIKE THE SES HANDBOOK FROM PLAINTIFFS NEW EXHIBIT LIST) by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 100 MOTION to Admit Defendant's Exhibit 4 filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 101 MOTION for Adverse Inference or to Allow Testimony filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 103 Notice (Other), 102 Notice (Other) (RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO UNTIMELY NOTICE OF FILING OF PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 12) filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Jean Seo on behalf of THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Seo, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List Revised 8/12/2013 by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Exhibit 12 (refiled with Ex. 11) by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Exhibit 12 by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 12)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Adverse Inference or to Allow Testimony by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Admit Defendant's Exhibit 4 by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit 4, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 98 Trial Brief filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part Banks's motion 92 to strike. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/8/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 92 MOTION to Strike 91 Pretrial Statement, filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Valencia R. Rainey on behalf of DENISE A. BANKS. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 92 MOTION to Strike 91 Pretrial Statement, filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (8/1/2013 Email chain), # 2 Exhibit B (6/17/2013 Ct. Tr.), # 3 Exhibit C (Pl's Admin. Compl.), # 4 Exhibit D (Pl's EEO Aff.), # 5 Exhibit E (Pl's Init. Discls.), # 6 Exhibit F (USDA Interrog. Resps.), # 7 Exhibit G (Pl's 1999 Appraisal), # 8 Exhibit H (10/1/1999 Fax), # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by DENISE A. BANKS re 92 MOTION to Strike 91 Pretrial Statement, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike 91 Pretrial Statement, by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL STATEMENT by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Defendant's Revised Trial Exhibit List), # 2 Exhibit B (Defendant's Revised Proposed Jury Instructions), # 3 Exhibit C (Defendant's Revised Verdict Form))(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 89 Notice (Other) of Future Filing filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FUTURE FILING by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Banks's motion 80 in limine. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/31/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Hudak on behalf of THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Stratton on behalf of THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY re 83 Response to Order of the Court filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Status Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER, THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Exclude Witnesses and Exhbiits filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal and Motion in Limine by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles). Added MOTION in Limine on 6/17/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Findings of Fact by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 77 MOTION that witness Jean Mahoney be allowed to testify by telephone filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION that witness Jean Mahoney be allowed to testify by telephone by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Redacted Exhibits by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 (CRAT Report), # 2 Exhibit 5 (GAO Report), # 3 Exhibit 6 (Long Term Improvement Plan))(Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Defendant's Exhibits)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits)(Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 MOTION in Limine , 67 MOTION in Limine filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 65 MOTION in Limine filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The parties shall file and submit by 9:00 a.m. on June 13, 2013 their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law with supporting authorities related to Banks's ADEA claims. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/6/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 65 MOTION in Limine filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION in Limine , 67 MOTION in Limine filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motions In Limine)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Exhibit E - G)(Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Verdict Form, # 2 Jury Instructions, # 3 Exhbiti List)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Proposed Additional Jury Instructions, Verdict Form and Exhibit List by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Attachment C - Defendant's Proposed Jury's Instructions, # 2 Attachment D - Defendant's Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Attachment E - Defendant's Exhibit List)(Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Parties' Joint Pretrial Materials by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Joint Pretrial Statement, # 2 Attachment A to Joint Pretrial Statement (Voir Dire), # 3 Attachment B to Joint Pretrial Statement (Jury Instructions))(Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Addy R. Schmitt on behalf of THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Schmitt, Addy) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER: Parties shall file and jointly submit to Chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 28, 2013 a single, agreed-upon set of trial materials. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/19/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the defendant's motion 38 for summary judgment, denying the plaintiff's motion 46 for partial summary judgment, and ordering the parties to appear for a scheduling conference on April 16, 2013 at 10:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/26/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of THOMAS JAMES VILSACK Substituting for attorney Oliver W. McDaniel (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Revised Reply at Defendant's Request by DENISE A. BANKS re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Oliver W. McDaniel on behalf of THOMAS J. VILSACK Substituting for attorney Christian A. Natiello (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by THOMAS J. VILSACK. (See Docket Entry 51 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Further Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts (Exhibit 1), # 3 Statement of Facts (Exhibit 2), # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 8A, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts (Exhibit 1), # 3 Statement of Facts (Exhibit 2), # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 8A, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by One Day by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1 - 4, # 4 Exhibit 5 - 7, # 5 Exhibit 8 - 12, # 6 Exhibit 13 - 18)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by DENISE A. BANKS, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting a Settlement Conference for 4/21/2010, at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 04/06/10. (DM) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for Settlement purpose (ls, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, (Joint Response) filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER; setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal, Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/7/09. (hs) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/26/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ED SCHAFER filed by DENISE A. BANKS.(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Hardin)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2008. Answer due by 9/22/2008, (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order filed by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' joint motion [14] to continue the August 8, 2008 initial scheduling conference and for leave to file plaintiff's amended complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff may amend her complaint by August 22, 2008. Defendant shall answer by September 22, 2008. The intial scheduling conference is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled upon the filing of defendant's answer to the first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/4/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Reset the Due Dates for the Post-discovery Status Conference and Dispositive Motions by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; see order for additional deadlines.. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/3/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Day, Jr on behalf of DENISE A. BANKS (Day, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by DENISE A. BANKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, Charles) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DENISE A. BANKS. Attorney Clarissa H. Wu terminated. (Wu, Clarissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: initial disclosures due by 11/24/08; proponent's expert witness designations due by 12/23/08; opponent's expert witness designations due by 1/22/09; all discovery closed 3/23/09; dispositive motions due by 5/4/09. The post-discovery status conference is scheduled for 4/2/09 at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/24/08. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Clarissa H. Wu on behalf of DENISE A. BANKS (Wu, Clarissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Day, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for October 24, 2008 at 9:15 a.m. Joint Local Civil Rule 16.3 report due five business days prior. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/6/2008. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for August 8, 2008 at 9:15 a.m.; Lcoal Rule 16.3 report due five business days prior. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/26/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER, ED SCHAFER. Related document: 15 Amended Complaint filed by DENISE A. BANKS.(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by DENISE A. BANKS.(Natiello, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/26/2008, (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's unopposed motion [8] for an extension of time until June 26, 2008 to respond to the complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/16/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER (Natiello, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/26/2008 (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's second consent motion [7] for an extension of time to respond to the complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Defendant's response shall be filed by May 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/25/08. (lcrwr2 )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER (Natiello, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/25/2008. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's consent motion [6] for an extension of time until 4/25/08 to respond to the complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/3/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Natiello, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of CHARLES F. CONNER Substituting for attorney Brian Hudak (Natiello, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3)(Day, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DENISE A. BANKS served on 1/28/2008, answer due 3/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Day, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 01/28/08. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2)(Day, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against CHARLES F. CONNER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616007388) filed by DENISE A. BANKS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CHARLES F. CONNER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?