THOMPSON v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01848-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Earl Thompson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/15/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address by JAMES EARL THOMPSON (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Service on Plaintiff by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Owens, Cindy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Cindy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Response to Document
        RESPONSE re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES EARL THOMPSON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 ERRATA
          ERRATA to correct the heading on page 8 of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. (Owens, Cindy)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Notice of QC
            NOTICE re [15] Errata; emailed to cindy.owens@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. An Errata did not accompany the filing. (nmw, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
              Order advising the plaintiff to respond by July 17, 2008, to the defendant's summary judgment motion or risk entry of judgment for the defendant. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 6/10/08.(ah)
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 ERRATA
                ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA to correct the heading on Page 8 of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to be "Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment" by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. (Owens, Cindy) Modified on 6/11/2008 (nmw, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit I, # (2) Exhibit II, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Cindy)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Owens, Cindy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER directing the defendant to file its summary judgment motion by June 9, 2008. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 5/8/08. (ah)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: defendant to file its summary judgment motion by June 9, 2008 (jwd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Response to Document
                          RESPONSE re [9] Answer to Complaint filed by JAMES EARL THOMPSON. (tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                            STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on December 28, 2007. Read this Standing Order carefully, it will govern this case. Failure to follow the Standing Order will result in sanctions.(jwd)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Answer
                              ANSWER to Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JAMES EARL THOMPSON.(Interrante, John)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 11/1/2007, answer due 12/31/2007. (lc, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney on 10/31/2007. (lc, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by 12/30/2007. (mpt, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [6] the defendant's motion for extension of time to answer. Upon consideration of the defendant's motion and for good cause shown therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before December 30, 2007. SO ORDERED. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS answer due 12/30/2007. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/05/2007.
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Interrante on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Interrante, John)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/19/07. (jf, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $1.38 be made from Prison Account of James Earl Thompson; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on October 10, 2007. (jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007, Terminated: 10/15/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES EARL THOMPSON (jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by JAMES EARL THOMPSON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                    SUMMONS (3) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?