GRAFFIUS v. MANSFIELD
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01875-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CARRIE GRAFFIUS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MELVILLE JOHNSON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobbie L. James-Hoye +1 404 524 9111 +1 404 524 6611 bhoye@melvillejohnson.com
v.
No Logo GORDON H. MANSFIELD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/17/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008, Terminated: 7/24/2008 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by CARRIE GRAFFIUS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(James-Hoye, Bobbie)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Order on Motion to Compel
    MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudce [17] Motion to Compel Discovery Responses because the movant did not comply with LCvR 7(m), which imposes a duty on counsel to confer with opposing counsel before filing any nondispositive motion and to "include [in the motion] a statement that the required discussion occurred. and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 24, 2008. (NP)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice to Take Deposition
      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carolyn Kastermann (Gill) by CARRIE GRAFFIUS.(James-Hoye, Bobbie)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Request for Admissions
        REQUEST for Admissions by CARRIE GRAFFIUS.(James-Hoye, Bobbie)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Request for Production of Documents
          REQUEST for Production of Documents by CARRIE GRAFFIUS.(James-Hoye, Bobbie)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Interrogatories Propounded
            INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendant by CARRIE GRAFFIUS.(James-Hoye, Bobbie)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 28, 2008. (NP)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Scheduling Conference
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Scheduling Conference held on 4/18/2008. Joint proposed scheduling order shall be submitted to the court for review and approval by 4/24/2008. If the case is not resolved before the next status conference set for 2/13/2009 @ 11:00 AM, trial and pretrial dates will be scheduled at the next conference. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Pretrial Statement
                  PRETRIAL STATEMENT by GORDON H. MANSFIELD. (Natiello, Christian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Pretrial Statement
                    PRETRIAL STATEMENT by CARRIE GRAFFIUS. (James-Hoye, Bobbie)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [9] Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Permission to Appear Via Telephone for Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 26, 2008. (NP)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008, Terminated: 3/26/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear
                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Telephone For Initial Scheduling Conference by CARRIE GRAFFIUS (James-Hoye, Bobbie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of GORDON H. MANSFIELD Substituting for attorney Blanche Bruce (Natiello, Christian)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference on April 18, 2008 at 11:45 a.m. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 17, 2008. (NP)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Answer
                              Defendant's Amended ANSWER to [1] Complaint by GORDON H. MANSFIELD. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by CARRIE GRAFFIUS.(Bruce, Blanche)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Rule 26a1 Statement
                                RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Attachment A to Initial Disclosures, # (2) Supplement Attachment B to Initial Disclosures)(James-Hoye, Bobbie)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (James-Hoye, Bobbie)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Answer
                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by GORDON H. MANSFIELD. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by CARRIE GRAFFIUS.(Bruce, Blanche)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie L. James-Hoye on behalf of CARRIE GRAFFIUS (James-Hoye, Bobbie)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Summons Reissued as to AUSA
                                        SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to GORDON H. MANSFIELD, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT against GORDON H. MANSFIELD ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616007663) filed by CARRIE GRAFFIUS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to GORDON H. MANSFIELD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?