BROWN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01931-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Attorney's Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/25/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2008. (lin, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
    Order advising plaintiff that he may supplement his response to the motion [24] to dismiss. Any supplement is due 10/6/2008.Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/4/08. (EHS)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Response to Document
      RESPONSE re [24] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN. (jf, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts, # (2) Declaration FBI, # (3) Exhibit FBI Declaration Exhibits, # (4) Declaration BOP, # (5) Declaration OIP, # (6) Declaration EOUSA, # (7) Declaration Criminal Division, DOJ)(Owens, Cindy)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2008. (lin, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion [20] for more time through 8/14/08 to file a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/11/08. (EHS)
              LREF
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Response to Document
              RESPONSE re [21] MEMORANDUM re [20] MOTION for Extension of Time to to file a motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment filed by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN. (jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of Change of Address by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN (jf, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Memorandum
                  MEMORANDUM re [20] MOTION for Extension of Time to to file a motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Owens, Cindy)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                    MINUTE ORDER: Defendants seek yet a fifth extension of time for responding to the complaint served upon them over eight months ago. They state they "need[ ] the additional time to prepare the responses briefings [sic] from... the U.S. Attorney's Office and the U.S. Attorney General's Office." Mot. at 2. These two offices have been defendants from the beginning. There is nothing new about that. Defendants offer no reason why they need additional time to respond. They offer no basis -- and no assurance -- for why this additional period sought will this time be the last extension needed. It is hereby ORDERED that a ruling on defendants' motion [20] for additional time be, and hereby is, DEFERRED with leave for the defendants to file a supplemental memorandum within 5 business days addressing the previous two sentences, given that any additional extension will be the final one. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/28/08. (EHS)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to to file a motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Cindy)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                        MINUTE ORDER (paperless): It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' fourth motion [18] for additional time to respond to the complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants are advised that further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. The defendants' response is due July 10, 2008. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/22/08. (EHS)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MINUTE ORDER (paperless): It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion [13] for default judgment be, and hereby is, DENIED for failure to comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 05/22/2008. (EHS)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Response to Document
                            RESPONSE re [18] MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN. (jf, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008, Terminated: 5/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Cindy)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS Substituting for attorney John G. Interrante (Owens, Cindy)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                  MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' two motions [11] and [12] for additional time through May 13, 2008, to file dispositive motions and/or answers be, and hereby are, GRANTED. The response is due 5/13/2008.Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 04/16/08. (EHS)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Interrante, John)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION for adjudgment of Defendants' default rule filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Interrante, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [12] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment filed by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN. (jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION for adjudgment of Defendants' default rule by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN (jf, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                MINUTE ORDER: Since Defendant's third motion [10] for enlargement of time to respond to the complaint appears to have not been proofread, contains factual errors, and repeats a peculiar excuse about an inability to respond to the complaint because of its vagueness without explaining how an extension of time will make it less vague, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion be, and hereby is, DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing a rewritten motion within 5 days. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/3/08.(ah)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/13/2008. (mm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                      MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to February 13, 2008, to respond to the complaint [9] shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/5/08.(ah)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint [7] shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/7/08.(ah)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007, Terminated: 2/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney on 10/31/2007. (lc, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 1/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Filing Fee Received
                                                                Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 4616008642 (jf, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Interrante on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Interrante, John)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/5/2007, answer due 1/4/2008; UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE served on 11/5/2007, answer due 1/4/2008. (jf, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      MOTION to rescind order granting payment re [3] Order Directing Prisoner Payment by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN (jf, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $4.05 be made from Prison Account of Timothy Demitri Brown; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/19/07. (jf, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007, Terminated: 10/25/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN (jf, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                              Summons (5) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, BUREAU OF PRISONS. (jf, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 250 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?