ANTONELLI v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02016-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI, Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $80000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-01180-CKK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Response to Document
RESPONSE re [29],[30] Cross MOTION for partial Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI; (See Docket no. [58] to view document) (td, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
    REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Motion to Strike
      MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response Declaration to Declaration of Karen Summers As To BOP & OIP by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY (Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
        REPLY to opposition to motion re [38] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY. (Kidwell, Judith)
          LREF
          Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [34] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Kidwell, Judith)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
            MINUTE ORDER granting [49] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to August 25, 2008, to file reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/22/08.(ah)
              LREF
              Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 ERRATA
              ERRATA for Docket No. 53-3 by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Two)(Kidwell, Judith)
                LREF
                Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [52] MOTION from judgment as to ICE filed by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit one, # (2) Exhibit Two)(Kidwell, Judith)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  MOTION from judgment as to ICE by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 51 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Response to Document
                    RESPONSE re [34] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI; (See Entry No. [50] to view document) (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY (Kidwell, Judith)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Response to Document
                          RESPONSE memorandum in support of BOP and OIP Traverses to Dispositive Motions filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Reply to Document
                            REPLY to BOP & OIP's statement of material facts as to which there is no genuine issue re [37],[38] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2008: # (2) Response to Declaration of Karen Summers, # (3) Response to Janice Mcleod's Declaration) (td, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/4/08. (ah)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [30] U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [32] U.S. Marshals Service's Motion to Dismiss; denying [13] Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/4/08.(ah)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 44 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Response to Document
                                  RESPONSE re [37], [38] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, ) Modified on 8/4/2008 adding (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. [43] TO VIEW DOCUMENT) (td, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [32] MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Kidwell, Judith)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Response to Document
                                        RESPONSE re [32] MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, ).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/25/2008 (clv, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [40] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to July 25, 2008, to respond to the Marshals Service's dispositive motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/2/08.(ah)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Marshals dispositive motion by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                                Order advising plaintiff to respond by July 25, 2008, to the Bureau of Prisons and Office of Information and Privacy's dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/12/08. (ah)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 7/25/200. (dot, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss, or alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY. (See Docket Entry [37] to view document). (nmw, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit 1-42, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit A-Z, # (5) Exhibit AA-ZZ, # (6) Exhibit AAA-III)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                                        Order advising plaintiff to respond by July 21, 2008, to the FBI's dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/10/08. (ah)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Order advising the plaintiff to respond by July 17, 2008, to the United States Marshals Service's dispositive motion or risk entry of judgment for the movant. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/10/08. (ah)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to the US Marshals Service's dispositive motion due by 7/17/2008. (dot, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [28] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting [31] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to file responses and dispositive motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/10/08.(ah)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss, or alternatively, Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (See Docket Entry [33] to view document). (nmw, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit A-Z, # (4) Exhibit AA-ZZ, # (5) Exhibit AAA-III, # (6) Exhibit A-I)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit A-Z, # (3) Exhibit AA-ZZ, # (4) Exhibit AAA-III)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses and Dispositive Motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                        Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (See Docket Entry [29] to view document). (nmw, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit 1-5)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses and Dispositive Motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [27] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to June 2, 2008 to file dispositive motions and responses to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/13/08. (ah)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Responses to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Dispositive Motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER directing defendants ICE and FBI to file either a proposed briefing schedule or a dispositive motion by June 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/1/08. (ah)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/12/2008. Defendants' ICE and FBI proposed Briefing schedule due by 6/2/2008. (dot, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying [18] Plaintiff's motion for refund of filing fee allegedly paid twice, inasmuch as the plaintiff has provided no proof of a duplicate payment and the docket reflects just one payment of the $350 filing fee on November 30, 2007. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/1/08.(ah)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [24] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to May 12, 2008, to file a response to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/1/08.(ah)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Answer
                                                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI.(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 5/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to Office of Information and Privacy served 11/13/08; answer due 1/14/2008(td, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/30/2008. (dot, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [21] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to April 30, 2008 to respond to the complaint and plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/1/08.(ah)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI.(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answers and Responses by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/17/2008. (dot, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [19] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to March 17, 2008, to respond to the complaint and plaintiff's other filings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/29/08.(ah)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008, Terminated: 2/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answers and Responses to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [14] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to February 29, 2008, to respond to the complaint and plaintiff's other filings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/25/08.(ah)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  MOTION to return $350.00 paid twice by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Memorandum
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (td, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE Declaration by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008, Terminated: 2/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses to Complaint and Responses to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Response to Document
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in support re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(td, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 12/4/2007, answer due 2/4/2008. (td, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/14/2008 (td, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/14/2008. (td, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to January 31, 2008, to Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/3/07.(ah)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                      Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 4616008664 (jf)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007, Terminated: 12/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of all defendants (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE served on 11/14/2007, answer due 1/14/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 11/14/07. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly signed on November 9, 2007. (SM)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Michael C. Antonelli and ORDER granting [3] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/1/07. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                                                                                                  PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007, Terminated: 11/8/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI (td, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. Case related to Case No. 04-1180 CKK. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by MICHAEL C. ANTONELLI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (7) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION AND PRIVACY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?