INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02092-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Institute for Public Representation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by law.georgetown.edu Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Vladeck +1 202 662 9540 vladeckd@law.georgetown.edu
v.
Federal Communications Commission Federal Communications Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo Bia Financial Network, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Hamilton Korns +1 202 452 7939 +1 202 452 7989 john.korns@bipc.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/16/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 894 - Energy Allocation Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 11001
Terminated 7/9/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-I
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION. (Vladeck, David)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
    MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for extension of time [16] to July 11, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on June 20, 2008. (MT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Vladeck, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008, Terminated: 7/9/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
        MOTION for Summary Judgment by BIA FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support Mem. P&A in Support of SJ Motion, # (2) Statement of Facts Material Facts...No Genuine Issue, # (3) Declaration Mark R. Fratrik Declaration, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Granting SJ Motion, # (5) Certificate of Service)(Korns, John)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BIA FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. (nmw, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Answer
            ANSWER to [1] Complaint by BIA FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC.. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION.(nmw, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion to Intervene
              MINUTE ORDER granting movant BIA Financial Network, Inc.'s motion to intervene as a defendant [12]. Signed by Judge James Robertson on June 11, 2008. (MT)
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Motion to Intervene
                MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by BIA FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Answer, # (3) Certificate of Disclosure)(tg, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                  MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time [11] to June 20, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 21, 2008. (MT)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008, Terminated: 5/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Vladeck, David)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008, Terminated: 7/9/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                        MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time [9] to May 9, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 6, 2008. (MT)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008, Terminated: 5/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Kidwell, Judith)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                            MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time [8] to May 5, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 1, 2008. (MT)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 5/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time [7] to April 30, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 1, 2008. (MT)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER that defendant, within 30 days from the date of this order, file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a document production schedule. Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 28, 2008. (MT)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 7/9/2008 Motion for Vaughn Index
                                      MOTION for Vaughn Index by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Law, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Vladeck, David)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Answer
                                        ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION.(Kidwell, Judith)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                          MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time [3] to January 31, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 4, 2007. (MT)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616008405) filed by INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?