STRINGFELLOW v. PERRY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02149-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANITA L. STRINGFELLOW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischer, Morris Eli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morris Eli Fischer +1 301 328 7631 +1 301 328 7638 morris@mfischerlaw.com
v.
No Logo STEPHEN A. PERRY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/28/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1500000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Answer
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by STEPHEN A. PERRY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by ANITA L. STRINGFELLOW.(Natiello, Christian)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Completed Service of Process by ANITA L. STRINGFELLOW re Summons Issued as to AUSA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Fischer, Morris)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
      STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/4/2007. (CMcP, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against STEPHEN A. PERRY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616008613) filed by ANITA L. STRINGFELLOW. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
          SUMMONS (3) Issued as to STEPHEN A. PERRY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 85 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?