JONES v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02164-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 21, 2017 at 4:40 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LAURA C. JONES, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ALAN R. SWENDIMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian L. Borum +1 202 514 6531 +1 202 307 6059 Marian.L.Borum@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian L. Borum +1 202 514 6531 +1 202 307 6059 Marian.L.Borum@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/30/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
        MOTION for Extension of Time for forty-five days to seek counsel by LAURA C. JONES. (jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
            MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed [14] Motion to Stay is granted. Proceedings in this action are stayed for 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/24/08. (ms, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Motion to Stay
              MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 45 days by LAURA C. JONES. (jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment by 6/20/2008, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/21/08. (ms, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  MINUTE ORDER: Defenants' unopposed [11] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/16/08. (ms, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Affidavit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Exhibit, # (13) Affidavit, # (14) Exhibit, # (15) Exhibit, # (16) Affidavit, # (17) Exhibit, # (18) Exhibit, # (19) Exhibit, # (20) Exhibit, # (21) Exhibit, # (22) Exhibit, # (23) Exhibit, # (24) Exhibit, # (25) Exhibit, # (26) Exhibit)(Borum, Marian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008, Terminated: 5/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/30/2008. (lin, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' unopposed [10] Motion for Extension is granted nunc pro tunc, and the Answer or other response to the complaint shall be filed by 4/30/2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/16/08. (ms, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Kidwell, Judith)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/2/2008. (lin, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' unopposed [9] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer is due by 4/2/2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/31/08. (ms, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses by GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Kidwell, Judith)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/21/2008. (lin, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                      MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' unopposed [8] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the complaint is due by 3/21/2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/14/08. (ms, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants, Alan R.Swendiman and by GEORGE W. BUSH (Kidwell, Judith)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Kidwell, Judith)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Marian L. Borum on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Borum, Marian)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ALAN R. SWENDIMAN. The Return Receipt card does not indicate date of service. (tg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 12/10/2007, answer due 2/8/2008. (jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/05/07., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to GEORGE W. BUSH served on 12/12/2007, answer due 2/11/2008. (jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAURA C. JONES (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT against GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by LAURA C. JONES. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                                                        FIAT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/27/07. (jf, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                          SUMMONS (4) Issued as to GEORGE W. BUSH, ALAN R. SWENDIMAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?