CLIFFORD v. SIVLEY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02147-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KURTIS ALLEN CLIFFORD, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo HOWARD SHULMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEPHANIE BURNS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo WILLIAM SIVLEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/28/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 6/17/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-L
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting as conceded [11] defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 17, 2008. (MA)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER that plaintiff shall respond to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than April 16, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 11, 2008. (MA)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 4/16/2008. (mm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 6/17/2008 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss by Stephanie Burns, by WILLIAM SIVLEY, HOWARD SHULMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11)(Kidwell, Judith)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/7/2008. (mm)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
            MINUTE ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting [10] defendants' motion for extension of time to up to and including March 7, 2008 to answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 12, 2008. (MA)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008, Terminated: 2/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Howard Shulman, Stephanie Burns and by WILLIAM SIVLEY (Kidwell, Judith)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of all defendants (Kidwell, Judith)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/17/07. (td, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 12/13/2007, answer due 2/11/2008 (td, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                      SUMMONS (5) Issued as to WILLIAM SIVLEY, HOWARD SHULMAN, STEPHANIE BURNS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying [3] Motion for injunctive relief ; denying [4] Motion to expedite ; denying [5] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/26/07. (td, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Motion to Compel
                          MOTION to Compel disclosure by KURTIS ALLEN CLIFFORD (td, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION to expedite by KURTIS ALLEN CLIFFORD (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007, Terminated: 11/28/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MOTION for emergency injunctive relief by KURTIS ALLEN CLIFFORD (td, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KURTIS ALLEN CLIFFORD (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against WILLIAM SIVLEY, HOWARD SHULMAN, STEPHANIE BURNS filed by KURTIS ALLEN CLIFFORD. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Summons Not Issued
                                    SUMMONS Not Issued as to WILLIAM SIVLEY, HOWARD SHULMAN, STEPHANIE BURNS (td, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?