CHATTERJEE v. U.S. CONSUL GENERAL et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02172-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SAMAR CHATTERJEE, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Uscis, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/3/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-L
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Court Appointed Counsel by SAMAR CHATTERJEE (Gaeta, Judith)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER that counsel shall be appointed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 15, 2008. (MA)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: 5/14/2008 Minute Entry for Meet and Confer Status Conference corrected to reflect that no oral motion for appointment of counsel was made. (zmm)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Meet and Confer Hearing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Meet and Confer Status Conference held on 5/14/2008. Counsel to be appointed for Plaintiff. All proceedings stayed until counsel appointed. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm) Modified on 5/15/2008 (zmm).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
          Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/14/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Order
            MINUTE ORDER that the status conference scheduled for May 14, 2008 at 9:15 a.m. is rescheduled to 9:00 a.m. the same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2008. (MA)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER that plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than June 16, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 9, 2008. (MA)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendants' motion to dismiss due by 6/16/2008. (mm)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Cook Declaration), # (2) Exhibit 2 (Dybdahl Declaration))(Meriweather, Robin)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings: Meet and Confer Status Conference set for 5/14/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [10] consent motion to continue the initial scheduling conference. The status conference formerly scheduled for April 29, 2008 is continued to May 14, 2008 at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 28, 2008. (MA)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion to Continue
                        Consent MOTION to Continue by U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS (Meriweather, Robin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Meriweather, Robin)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Meet & Confer Statement due by 4/23/2008. Meet and Confer Status Conference set for 4/29/2008 09:45 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MINUTE ORDER granting [8] defendant's motion for extension of time up to and including April 23, 2008 for the parties to submit a Rule 16.3 report; granting [8] motion to dontinue the initial scheduling conference. The status conference formerly scheduled for April 22, 008 is continued to April 29, 2008 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 16, 2008. (MA)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint 16.3 Report, MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS (Meriweather, Robin)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Response to Document
                                  RESPONSE re [6] Answer to Complaint filed by SAMAR CHATTERJEE. (jf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order
                                    MINUTE ORDER: Meet and Confer Status Conference set for 4/22/2008 @ 09:15 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. The parties shall meet, confer and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 4/15/2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/25/2008. (mm)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Answer
                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint by U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by SAMAR CHATTERJEE.(Meriweather, Robin)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 1/7/2008, answer due 3/7/2008 (tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. CIS served on 12/21/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (td, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/21/07. (td, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                              SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAMAR CHATTERJEE (td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS filed by SAMAR CHATTERJEE. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Order
                                                    FIAT ORDER re [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SAMAR CHATTERJEE. (Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/21/07; "Leave to file without Prepayment of Cost GRANTED") (td, ) Modified on 12/7/2007 to show correct filed date (td, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Summons Not Issued
                                                      SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. CONSUL GENERAL, U.S. CIS (td, )
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?