HAMPTON v. CONNER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02221-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karl Hampton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy A. Harris +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 charris@katorparks.com
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo CHARLES F. CONNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/6/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2009. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) reports are due by 1/31/2009. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) reports are due by 2/29/2009. A status conference is scheduled for 4/9/2009, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/25/2008. (VT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Meet and Confer Hearing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 7/25/2008. Discovery due by 3/31/2009. Plaintiff Rule 26a2 due by 1/31/2009. Defendant Rule 26a2 due by 2/28/2009. Status Conference set for 4/9/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Jackie Sullivan) (gdf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of Filing Statement of the Case by KARL HAMPTON re [14] Meet and Confer Statement (Kator, Michael)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Natiello, Christian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Cathy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Answer
            ANSWER to [1] Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by KARL HAMPTON.(Natiello, Christian)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for July 25, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/25/2008. (VT)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [5] defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/25/2008. (VT)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                  Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHARLES F. CONNER. (Natiello, Christian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                      Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by KARL HAMPTON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18)(Harris, Cathy)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 5/9/2008 (gdf)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                          MINUTE ORDER granting [8] plaintiff's Second Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before May 9, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/21/2008. (VT)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 4/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss by KARL HAMPTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kator, Michael)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 4/25/2008 (gdf)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before April 25, 2008. (tj )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [7] plaintiff's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before April 25, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/3/2008. (VT)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss by KARL HAMPTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kator, Michael)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Kator on behalf of KARL HAMPTON (Kator, Michael)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss by CHARLES F. CONNER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Natiello, Christian)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of CHARLES F. CONNER Substituting for attorney Alan Burch (Natiello, Christian)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008, Terminated: 2/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by CHARLES F. CONNER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of CHARLES F. CONNER (Burch, Alan)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [3] defendant's Consent Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's complaint on or before March 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/12/2008. (VT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against CHARLES F. CONNER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616008870) filed by KARL HAMPTON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                    SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CHARLES F. CONNER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?