SLAUGHTER v. PETERS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02201-JMF
District Judge John M. Facciola, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Mary E Peters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Substitution of Counsel
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of MARY E. PETERS Substituting for attorney Raymond Martinez (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 ERRATA
    ERRATA by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER re [15] Memorandum in Opposition filed by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER. Re: [13] MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARY E. PETERS, (tg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARY E. PETERS. (Martinez, Raymond)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response to Show Cause due by 6/6/2008. (ldc, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to [13] MOTION to Dismiss filed by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER. (tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Response to Order of the Court
            RESPONSE TO ORDER to Show Cause filed by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER. (tg, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Order
              MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff, having failed to appear for today's scheduling conference, is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, on or before 6/6/08, why she should not be held in contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 5/23/08. (lcjmf1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss by MARY E. PETERS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit No.1, # (2) Exhibit No.2, # (3) Exhibit No. 3, # (4) Exhibit No. 4, # (5) Exhibit No. 5, # (6) Exhibit No.6, # (7) Exhibit No. 6a, # (8) Exhibit No. 7, # (9) Exhibit No. 8, # (10) Exhibit No. 9, # (11) Exhibit No. 10, # (12) Exhibit No. 11, # (13) Exhibit 10 a, # (14) Exhibit No. 12, # (15) Exhibit No. 13, # (16) Exhibit no. 14, # (17) Exhibit No. 14, # (18) Exhibit No. 15 Part 1, # (19) Exhibit No. 15 part2)(Martinez, Raymond)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for all purposes including trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 4/22/08. (SP, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (SP, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (kb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for Court Filing
                        Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER, MARY E. PETERS. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/15/08. (gdf)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Status Conference
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 4/15/2008. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Martinez, Raymond)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2008 09:45 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for April 15, 2008, at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/7/2008. (VT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                  MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [6] defendant's Motion to Enlarge Time to Answer the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/7/2008. (VT)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Answer
                                    Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by MARY E. PETERS. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint with added numbered paragraphs)(Martinez, Raymond)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MARY E. PETERS (Martinez, Raymond)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond A. Martinez on behalf of MARY E. PETERS (Martinez, Raymond)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 12/31/2007, answer due 2/29/2008 (td, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MARY E. PETERS served on 12/10/2007, answer due 2/8/2008. (td, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/10/07. (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against MARY E. PETERS ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616008824) filed by JUDINE E. SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MARY E. PETERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?