District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court United States Supreme Court

CITIZENS UNITED v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02240-RCL-RWR
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 6:08 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Citizens United, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bopp Coleson & Bostrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton J. Callen +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 2685 ccallen@bopplaw.com
Space Richard E. Coleson +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 rcoleson@bopplaw.com
Space Jeffrey P Gallant +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 234 3685 jgallant@bopplaw.com
Space James Bopp, Jr. +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 jboppjr@aol.com
v.
Federal Election Commission Federal Election Commission, Defendant

Represented by Federal Election Commission

No Logo Campaign Legal Center, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by J. GERALD HEBERT, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Gerald Hebert +1 703 628 4673 +1 202 736 2222 hebert@voterlaw.com
No Logo DEMOCRACY 21, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Jay Simon +1 202 682 0240 +1 202 682 0249 dsimon@sonosky.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 11001
Terminated 7/18/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-953'['Supreme Court of the United States'], '08-205'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, TYPE-N
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 USCA Case Number
U.S. Supreme Court Case Number 08-205 for [67] Notice of Appeal, filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 67 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the U.S. Supreme Court as to [66] Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, [65] Memorandum & Opinion by CITIZENS UNITED. Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 4616013881. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (tg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 66 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [43] Motion to Dismiss; denying [52] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [55] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on July 18, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
        LREF
        Blank 73 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
        US SUPREME COURT JUDGMENT as to 67 Notice of Appeal, filed by CITIZENS UNITED (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
          LREF
          Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on July 18, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
            US SUPREME COURT OPINION as to 67 Notice of Appeal, filed by CITIZENS UNITED reversing the judgment with respect to the constitutionality of 2 U.S.C. Section 441b's restrictions on corporate independent expenditures; affirming the judgment with respect to Bipartisan Campaign Reform Act's disclaimer and disclosure requirements; remanding the case for further proceedings consistent with the opinion. The judgment will issue after the expiration of 25 days from the date of the Opinion unless a timely petition for rehearing is filed. (jeb, ) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
              REPLY to opposition to motion re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Exhibit
                EXHIBIT 8 to 55 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(tg, ) (Exhibit 8 UNSEALED pursuant to Order entered 2/6/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Bopp, James)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Order on Motion to Unseal DocumentCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 69 Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/6/2009. (lcrcl1, ) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Notice of QC
                      NOTICE re [61] Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to jboppjr@aol.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Combined Opposition and Reply filed. Counsel is directed to file the Reply separately. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Motion to Unseal Document
                        Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document Exhibit 8 to FEC's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                          Memorandum in opposition to re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment and reply filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE from the U.S. Supreme Court dated 11/14/08 noting probable jurisdiction in this case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Amicus Brief
                              AMICUS BRIEF by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER, DEMOCRACY 21. (jf, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [58] Motion to Participate as Amici Curiae and to File Memorandum in Support of Defendant. Order entered by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts on June 11, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER, DEMOCRACY 21 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amici Brief)(nmw, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Exhibit Filed Under Seal by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Noti, Adav)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-7)(Noti, Adav)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-7)(Noti, Adav)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER dismissing Count 5 of the Amended Complaint pursuant to the stipulation of the parties. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on May 23, 2008.(lcrcl1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Stipulation
                                            STIPULATION Regarding Count 5 of the Amended Complaint by CITIZENS UNITED, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of David N. Bossie, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 US SUPREME COURT Judgment
                                                US SUPREME COURT JUDGMENT as to [41] Notice of Appeal, filed by CITIZENS UNITED, it is ordered and adjudged by this Court that the appeal is dismissed for want of jurisdiction. (USSC No. 07-953)(kb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Protective Order; granting joint motion [50] for protective order. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on April 18, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008, Terminated: 4/18/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                    Joint MOTION for Protective Order by CITIZENS UNITED, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [43] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of the Amended Complaint filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Noti, Adav)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/9/2008. Plaintiff's Motions due by 5/16/2008. Defendant's Motion/Response due by 6/6/2008. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/27/2008. Defendant's Reply in support of its motion due by 7/11/2008. (rje)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on April 2, 2008.(lcrcl1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [43] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of the Amended Complaint filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff"s Opposition due by 3/24/2008. (rje)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [44] Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on February 22, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of the Amended Complaint by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 USCA Case Number
                                                                        Supreme Court of the United States Case Number 07-953 for [41] Notice of Appeal, filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (tg, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Notice of Appeal
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the U.S. Supreme Court as to [38] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, [39] Memorandum & Opinion by CITIZENS UNITED. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616009634. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (tg, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                            ERRATA amending Memorandum Opinion [39]. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on January 16, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on January 15, 2008.(lcrcl1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying [5] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying [23] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts, on January 15, 2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Remark
                                                                                  Remark. Exhibit 2 to Amended Verified Complaint (Script of "Hillary: The Movie") has been UNSEALED pursuant to Order filed 1/10/2008..... (tg, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER unsealing [32] script of Hillary: The Movie; providing that both script and DVD of Hillary: The Movie shall be available for public viewing in the Clerk's office. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts on 01/10/2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying [35] Motion for Leave to File Affidavit of David N. Bossie. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts on 01/10/2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before a Three Judge Panel of Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts : Preliminary Injunction held on 1/10/2008. (Court Reporter Wendy Ricard.) (rje)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008, Terminated: 1/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER filed in USCA dated December 20, 2007, designating Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and District Judge Richard W. Roberts to serve with District Judge Royce C. Lamberth to hear and determine this case; directing that Circuit Judge Randolph will preside. Signed by Douglas H. Ginsburg on 12/20/07. (gt, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [23] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                EXHIBIT 2 to Amended Verified Complaint (Script of "Hillary: The Movie" ) by CITIZENS UNITED.(tg, ) (Modified on 1/11/2008 to UNSEAL Exhibit pursuant to Order filed 1/10/2008.....(tg, ).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL. Order signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts on 01/07/2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE by CITIZENS UNITED re [27] Stipulation, [22] Amended Complaint (Bopp, James)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying [4] Motion to Expedite; denying [6] Motion to Consolidate Hearings; granting [7] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting [8] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting [9] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting [21] Motion to Seal Exhibit 2 of Amended Complaint. Signed by United States Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph and United States District Judges Royce C. Lamberth and Richard W. Roberts on 01/04/2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Opposition due by 1/8/2008. Preliminary Injunctions Hearing set for 1/10/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before a three-judge panel of Circuit Judge A. Raymond Randolph, District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, and District Judge Richard W. Roberts. (rje) Modified on 1/3/2008 (rje).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [24] Motion to Consolidate the Hearings on Preliminary Injunctions and Merits; granting in part and denying in part [25] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Entered by Three Judge Panel on December 31, 2007. (lcrcl3, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                            STIPULATION re [21] MOTION File Under Seal Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order by CITIZENS UNITED, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [25] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [23] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [23] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Adav Noti# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Deeley, Kevin)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  MOTION Consolidate Hearings by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 1/15/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION filed by CITIZENS UNITED.(tg, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 1/4/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                        MOTION File Under Seal by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Expedite filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hajjar, Steve)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [6] MOTION to consolidate hearings on preliminary injunction and merits filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hajjar, Steve)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/13/2007. (Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 12/13/2007, answer due 2/11/2008. (Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re [11] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General, [12] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC, and [10] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant were entered in error and counsel was instructed to properly refile said pleadings by listing a case caption and case number. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [3] Motion for Three-Judge Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/07. (rje)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CITIZENS UNITED re [6] MOTION to consolidate hearings on preliminary injunction and merits, [9] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [4] MOTION to Expedite, [7] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clayton J. Callen, :Firm- Bopp, Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clayton J. Callen, :Firm- Bopp, Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434., [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Summons Issued as to AUSA, [2] LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, [3] MOTION for Three-Judge Court, [1] Complaint, [8] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Bopp, James)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Bopp, James) Modified on 12/17/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/13/2007. (Bopp, James) Modified on 12/17/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 12/13/2007, answer due 2/11/2008. (Bopp, James) Modified on 12/17/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard E. Coleson, :Firm- Bopp, Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey P. Gallant, :Firm- Bopp, Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clayton J. Callen, :Firm- Bopp, Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to consolidate hearings on preliminary injunction and merits by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 1/15/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 1/4/2008 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite by CITIZENS UNITED (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 12/14/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Three-Judge Court by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                                                                                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616008913) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 710 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?