KLOPF v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02246-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHAEL JAMES KLOPF, Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 9/22/2008. (rje)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
    Order advising plaintiff to respond by 9/22/2008 to defendant's motion, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/20/08. (ms, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
      MOTION to Transfer Case To the Eastern District of Kentucky by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER vacating in part the Court's August 4, 2008 Order [12], granting defendant's motion for an enlargement of time [11] nunc pro tunc, and directing defendant to file its answer or other response to the complaint within 10 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/11/08. (ms, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [8] Motion to Set Aside Default; VACATED [7] Clerk's Entry of Default. ORDERED granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/4/08. (rje)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Kidwell, Judith)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
              REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Set Aside Default and for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Cynthia R. Parker)(Kidwell, Judith)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to [8] MOTION to Set Aside Default and for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL JAMES KLOPF. (tg, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion to Set Aside Default
                  MOTION to Set Aside Default and for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Cynthia R. Parker)(Kidwell, Judith)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Clerks Entry of Default*
                    VACATED pursuant to court order entered 8/6/2008.....Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (tg, ) Modified on 8/7/2008 (tg, ).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Affidavit for Default
                      AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by MICHAEL JAMES KLOPF. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 1/2/2008, answer due 3/3/2008 (tg, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 1/2/2008. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008. (tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL JAMES KLOPF (tg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Affidavit
                              AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff, Proving Service of Summons and Complaint by MICHAEL JAMES KLOPF. (The return receipt cards do not show the defendants' or their agents' signatures nor they list a date of receipt). (tg, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by MICHAEL JAMES KLOPF. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?