LYSENKO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02247-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NIKOLAY I. LYSENKO, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/13/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-C
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Substitution of Counsel
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Raymond A. Martinez (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    MINUTE ORDER denying [11] Motion for Reconsideration. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration [of Request for] CM/ECF Password is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/21/08. (lcrbw3, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
      MOTION for Reconsideration CM/ECF password by NIKOLAY I. LYSENKO (td, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Response to Document
        RESPONSE to [9] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by NIKOLAY I. LYSENKO. (tg, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
          MINUTE ORDER finding as moot [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In light of the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4), it is ORDERED that the defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/26/08. (lcrbw3, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Martinez, Raymond)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Response to Document
              RESPONSE re [7] MOTION for More Definite Statement, [6] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, For A More Definite Statement filed by NIKOLAY I. LYSENKO. (td, )
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Motion for More Definite Statement
                MOTION (in the alternative) for More Definite Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry [6] to view document). (nmw, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, For A More Definite Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Martinez, Raymond)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond A. Martinez on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Martinez, Raymond)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/26/07. (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008 (td, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MINUTE ORDER denying [2] Motion. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Password is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/14/07. (lcrbw3, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION for CM/ECF Password by NIKOLAY I. LYSENKO (lc, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616008992) filed by NIKOLAY I. LYSENKO. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?