KOVURI v. RICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02268-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAYASEKHAR KOVURI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MURTHY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aron Avigdor Finkelstein +1 410 356 5440 +1 410 356 5669 aron@murthy.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo PAUL E. NOVAK, JR., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT S. MUELLER, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 1/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-D
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JAYASEKHAR KOVURI, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH. (Meriweather, Robin)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Status Conference
    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 1/2/2008.Defendant's motions due by 1/23/2008., Plainitff's responses due by 1/28/2008. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Memorandum
      MEMORANDUM re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAYASEKHAR KOVURI by JAYASEKHAR KOVURI. (Finkelstein, Aron)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EVELYN C. UPCHURCH served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PAUL E. NOVAK, JR served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EMILIO T. GONZALEZ served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ROBERT S. MUELLER, III served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. MICHAEL B. MUKASEY served on 12/20/2007, answer due 2/19/2008 (Finkelstein, Aron)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General December 20, 2007. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of all defendants (Meriweather, Robin)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                        STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/21/2007. (CMcP, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                          Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/2/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. A briefing schedule on [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAYASEKHAR KOVURI will be set at 1/2/2008 Status Conference. (lcrjl2, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAYASEKHAR KOVURI (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D Part 2# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I# (11) Exhibit J)(tg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616009087) filed by JAYASEKHAR KOVURI. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) Modified on 1/3/2008 (lc, ).
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                Summons (7) Issued as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH (tg, ) Modified on 1/3/2008 (lc, ).
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?