SRINIVASAN v. RICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02299-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anand, Srinivasan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MURTHY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aron Avigdor Finkelstein +1 410 356 5440 +1 410 356 5669 aron@murthy.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo PAUL E. NOVAK, JR., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT S. MUELLER, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/21/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 1/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-D
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ANAND SRINIVASAN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH. (Meriweather, Robin)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Status Conference
    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 1/2/2008.Defendant's motions due by 1/23/2008., Plainitff's responses due by 1/28/2008. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2007, Entered: 12/29/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
      Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/2/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. This Status Conference will be held in conjunction with the status conference in Kovuri v. Rice, 07cv2268, on 1/2/2008. A briefing schedule on [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment by ANAND SRINIVASAN will be set at the 1/2/2008 Status Conference. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 12/29/2007)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of all defendants (Meriweather, Robin)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment by ANAND SRINIVASAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit D - Part 2# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Text of Proposed Order # (11) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Notice of Related Case
            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANAND SRINIVASAN. Case related to Case No. 07-2268. (jf, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616009140) filed by ANAND SRINIVASAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) Modified on 1/2/2008 to correct receipt number (td, ).
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                SUMMONS (7) Issued as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALEZ, PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 109 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?