PARKASH v. RICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02298-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo OAM PARKASH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MURTHY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aron Avigdor Finkelstein +1 410 356 5440 +1 410 356 5669 aron@murthy.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo EMILIO T. GONZALES, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo PAUL E. NOVAK, JR., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT S. MUELLER, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/21/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 2/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-D
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, OAM PARKASH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALES. (Meriweather, Robin)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Order
    MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's application for preliminary injunction is deemed WITHDRAWN and the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for 2/4/08 is CANCELED. It is further ORDERED that the above-captioned case be governed by the following briefing schedule: defendants' Rule 12(b) motion is due on 3/11/08; plaintiff's opposition to defendants' Rule 12(b) motion is due 3/25/08; defendants' reply is due on 4/8/08. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/17/08. (lcrjl2, )(lcrjl2, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION for Discovery Expedited under FRCP 26(d) filed by PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALES. (Meriweather, Robin)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by OAM PARKASH re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Summary Judgment (Finkelstein, Aron)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Status Conference
          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 1/2/2008.Defendant's motions due by 1/23/2008., Plainitff's responses due by 1/28/2008. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EVELYN C. UPCHURCH served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PAUL E. NOVAK, JR served on 12/24/2007, answer due 2/22/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EMILIO T. GONZALES served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ROBERT S. MUELLER, III served on 12/24/2007, answer due 2/22/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. MICHAEL B. MUKASEY served on 12/26/2007, answer due 2/25/2008 (Finkelstein, Aron)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/1/2008, Entered: 1/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/26/2007. (Finkelstein, Aron)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Discovery
                          MOTION for Discovery Expedited under FRCP 26(d) by OAM PARKASH (Finkelstein, Aron)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2007, Entered: 12/29/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                            Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/2/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. This Status Conference will be held in conjunction with the status conference in Kovuri v. Rice, 07cv2268, on 1/2/2008. A briefing schedule on [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment by OAM PARKASH will be set at the 1/2/2008 Status Conference. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 12/29/2007)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of all defendants (Meriweather, Robin)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 1/11/2008..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment by OAM PARKASH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit D -Part 2# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Text of Proposed Order # (11) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) Modified on 1/14/2008 (nmw, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Notice of Related Case
                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by OAM PARKASH. Case related to Case No. 07-2268. (jf, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616009139) filed by OAM PARKASH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                      SUMMONS (7) Issued as to PAUL E. NOVAK, JR, EVELYN C. UPCHURCH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, EMILIO T. GONZALES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?