SCHWANER v. CHU
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02349-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACK A. SCHWANER, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DAVID S.C. CHU, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 6/16/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-C
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Letter
Letter from Jack A. Schwaner. "Let this be filed" by Emmet G. Sullivan (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
    Summons Returned Unexecuted as to DAVID S.C. CHU. (tg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [6] Defendant's unopposed Motion to Dismiss as conceded and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/10/08.(ah)
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Substitution of Counsel
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of DAVID S.C. CHU Substituting for attorney Darrell Valdez (Natiello, Christian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
          Order advising plaintiff to respond by April 16, 2008 to defendant's motion to dismiss or for a more definite statement or risk dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/11/08. (ah)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/2/2008. (clv, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/16/2008 (clv, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by DAVID S.C. CHU (Valdez, Darrell)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of DAVID S.C. CHU (Valdez, Darrell)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 1/14/08. (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 1/10/2008, answer due 3/10/2008 (td, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                        SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DAVID S.C. CHU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 1/3/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JACK A. SCHWANER (jf, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 1/3/2008 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against DAVID S.C. CHU (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by JACK A. SCHWANER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                              FIAT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/19/07. (jf, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 1/3/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                SUMMONS Not Issued as to DAVID S.C. CHU (jf, )
                                  LREF

                                  Space Space

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?