SCHULER v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00065-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KENNEDY SCHULER, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo HARLEY LAPPIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/14/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 ERRATA
ERRATA Amended Certificate of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN [15] MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN. (Natiello, Christian)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Remark
    Remark: The copy of the Order [#16] directing plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than September 10, 2008 that was originally mailed to plaintiff on August 11, 2008 was returned to sender. The Order was re-mailed to plaintiff on August 18, 2008 at 2840 Langston Place, S.E., Apt. 302, Washington, DC 20020. (VT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than September 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/11/2008. (VT)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Remark
        Remark: A copy of the Order [#16] directing plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than September 10, 2008 was mailed to plaintiff at 2640 Langston Place, S.E., Apt. 302, Washington, DC 20020 on August 11, 2008. (VT)
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN (Natiello, Christian)
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
            ORDER granting as conceded GEO Group, Inc.'s [9] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/15/08. (ms, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Remark
              Remark: A copy of the Order [#14] granting as conceded GEO Group, Inc.'s motion to dismiss was mailed to plaintiff at 2640 Langston Place, S.E., Apt. 302, Washington, DC 20020 on July 15, 2008. (ms, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response due by 8/10/2008, (gdf)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  MINUTE ORDER granting [13] defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiff's complaint on or before August 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/9/2008. (VT)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008, Terminated: 7/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN (Natiello, Christian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 5/12/08. (jf, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GEO GROUP, INC. served on 5/14/2008, answer due 6/3/2008 (jf, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to Defendant GEO Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss no later than July 3, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/3/2008. (VT)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 7/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss by GEO GROUP, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2, # (3) Attachment 3, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Israel, Deborah)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Reset Deadlines: plaintiff to respond to Defendant GEO Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss no later than July 3, 2008 (zj)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN (Natiello, Christian)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                  SUMMONS (5) Issued as to GEO GROUP, INC., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN, and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                    Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (tr, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting re [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by KENNEDY SCHULER. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/25/2008. (tr, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by KENNEDY SCHULER (ls, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner StatementCourt Filing
                                          PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/19/07. (ls, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel by KENNEDY SCHULER (ls, ) (tr, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008, Terminated: 3/26/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KENNEDY SCHULER (ls, ) (tr, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against GEO GROUP, INC., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN filed by KENNEDY SCHULER.(ls, ) (tr, ).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                                  SUMMONS Not Issued as to GEO GROUP, INC., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN (ls, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?