SPOTTS et al v. USA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00044-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo ANASTACIO CANTU, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo ANTHONY L. STUTSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo BAENA JOSE MENDOZA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo BERNADINO DELGADO, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo BILLY AGUERO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo BRENSON STOVALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo BRIAN J. MORONEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo CEDRIC HENDERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo CHARLES MONTGOMERY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo CURTIS GREER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo CURTIS LINDSEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo DONALD CHURCHILL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo DONALD G. RICHARDSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo DOUGLAS L. PERRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo EARL ELLIS HAWKINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo FRANCISCO SALDANA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo GABRIAL GARCIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo GARRETT DEETZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo GARRIE SAMUELS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo GREG C. LAXEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo GREGORY NESBIT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JACKIE LEE PULLUM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JAMIE GUERRERO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JOE LEWIS KELLY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JOHN LOCKETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JOHN M. POPE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JOSE BAZA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo JOSEPH RANDALL, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo KELVIN ANDRE SPOTTS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo KERRY D. LAURY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo L. C. BROOKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo LLOYD BATTLES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo MARCUS T. ARNOLD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo MATSUKATA KEELING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo MICHAEL HUGH SURRELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo MICHAEL NEUGEBAUER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo MICHAEL STARNES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo ODELL JONES, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo ODIS JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo OSCAR LONGORIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo OSCAR MARTINEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo PAUL SANTIVANEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo RAFAEL A. HERRERA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo RAS RAHIM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo RAY MCALLISTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo RICHARD ALLEN SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo Richard Cruz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo ROBERT STEEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo RODNEY L THOMPSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo SAMUAL L. JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo SOLOMON T. BURTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo STEVEN JACKSON HADO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo STEVEN WAYNE WOOLDRIDGE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo TYRONNE JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo WILLIAM MCCOY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo WILLIAM PEAY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo WILLIE JOE SPENCE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
No Logo WILLIE MAY SANDERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman L Sirak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman L Sirak +1 330 493 1947 +1 330 478 1991 nsirak@parolereform.com
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/9/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391 Personal Injury
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 7/7/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-B
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Receipt for Transfer Papers
Receipt on filed 07/07/2008 of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number 1:08-cv-00376 sent by Eastern District of TEXAS. (td, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Case Transferred Out
    Case transferred out to the USDC of U.S. District Court for Eastern Texas, pursuant to Court Order entered 6/23/08. Sent to Court by Extraction. (td, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Amended Complaint
      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(nmw, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 23, 2008. (lcckk2)
          LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order on Motion forJoinderCourt Filing
          ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion (1) Plaintiffs' [7] Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) Defendant's [9] Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Texas is GRANTED; and (3) Plaintiffs' pending [26] Motion and [27] Supplemental Motion for Joinder of additional plaintiffs are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 23, 2008. (lcckk2)
            LREF
            Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript
            Supplemental MOTION for Joinder [26] MOTION for Joinder of Three Additional Plaintiffs Pursuant to Rule 20(a) by Adding One More Plaintiff Bringing the total to be added by this Motion pursuant to Rule 20(a) to Four New Plaintiffs by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Sirak, Norman) Modified on 5/28/2008 (nmw, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 ~Motion for Joinder
              MOTION for Joinder of Three Additional Plaintiffs Pursuant to Rule 20(a) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Sirak, Norman)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS re [17] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [21] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [22] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [16] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [18] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [24] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [14] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [19] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [20] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [15] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [13] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [23] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Sirak, Norman)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMIE GUERRERO (td, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAMUAL L. JOHNSON (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JACKIE LEE PULLUM (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RODNEY L THOMPSON (td, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN JACKSON HADO (td, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD ALLEN SMITH (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAY MCALLISTER (td, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIE JOE SPENCE (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN WAYNE WOOLDRIDGE (td, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BERNADINO DELGADO, JR (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD G. RICHARDSON (td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOE LEWIS LEWIS (td, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Linda R. Thomas)(Natiello, Christian)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Sirak, Norman)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by KELVIN ANDRE SPOTTS (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (caseload spreadsheets for D.D.C. and E.D. Tx))(Natiello, Christian)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Natiello, Christian)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Second Amended Complaint, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit)(Sirak, Norman)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(znmw, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on February 27, 2008. (SM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Sirak, Norman)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ALL PLAINTIFFS served on 2/15/2008, answer due 4/15/2008. (Sirak, Norman)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General Feb. 14, 2008. (Sirak, Norman)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616009462) filed by RICHARD CRUZ, GARRETT DEETZ, GABRIAL GARCIA, CURTIS GREER, JAMIE GUERRERO, EARL ELLIS HAWKINS, CEDRIC HENDERSON, RAFAEL A. HERRERA, ODIS JACKSON, TYRONNE JACKSON, KELVIN ANDRE SPOTTS, SAMUAL L. JOHNSON, ODELL JONES, JR, MATSUKATA KEELING, KERRY D. LAURY, GREG C. LAXEY, CURTIS LINDSEY, JOHN LOCKETT, OSCAR LONGORIA, OSCAR MARTINEZ, RAY MCALLISTER, BILLY AGUERO, WILLIAM MCCOY, CHARLES MONTGOMERY, BRIAN J. MORONEY, GREGORY NESBIT, MICHAEL NEUGEBAUER, WILLIAM PEAY, DOUGLAS L. PERRY, JOHN M. POPE, RAS RAHIM, JOSEPH RANDALL, JR, MARCUS T. ARNOLD, FRANCISCO SALDANA, GARRIE SAMUELS, WILLIE MAY SANDERS, PAUL SANTIVANEZ, RICHARD ALLEN SMITH, MICHAEL STARNES, ROBERT STEEN, BRENSON STOVALL, ANTHONY L. STUTSON, MICHAEL HUGH SURRELL, BAENA JOSE MENDOZA, ALL PLAINTIFFS, L. C. BROOKS, LLOYD BATTLES, JOSE BAZA, SOLOMON T. BURTON, ANASTACIO CANTU, DONALD CHURCHILL. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                                                    SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (td, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?