IN RE: Subpoena to Condolezza Rice
Federal Court Proceeding District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-mc-00039-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Petitioner
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo DESIREE ALI-FAIROOZ, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Michael Copacino +1 202 662 9577 +1 202 662 4224 copacino@law.georgetown.edu
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/18/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 07-CDC-24980[Superior Court for the District of Columbia]
Def Custody Status
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
ORDER granting [2] Motion to Quash and denying [4] Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/19/2008. (lcrcl2, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 ERRATA
    ERRATA by CONDOLEEZA RICE [2] MOTION to Quash filed by CONDOLEEZA RICE. (Attachments: # (1) page 6 of 6 of Ex A)(Fields, Rhonda)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [2] MOTION to Quash filed by CONDOLEEZA RICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda)
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CONDOLEEZA RICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Motion to Remand to State Court
          MOTION for Remand to D.C. Superior Court by DESIREE ALI-FAIROOZ (tg, ) (See Docket Entry Number [3] to view document)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
            Memorandum in opposition to re [2] MOTION to Quash filed by DESIREE ALI-FAIROOZ. (tg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 2/19/2008 Motion to Quash
              MOTION to Quash subpoena by CONDOLEEZA RICE with Exhibit A and Enclosures 1 through 5. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Notice of Removal
                NOTICE OF REMOVAL of subpoena by CONDOLEEZA RICE from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 07-CDC-024980.(jeb, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 285 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?