ADAMS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00138-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACOB S. ADAMS, JR., Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/24/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 8/19/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION re [14] [16] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/19/2008. (VT)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [14] [16] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/19/2008. (VT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [16] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [14] MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B)(Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to motion to dismss or alternatively, motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/8/2008. (gdf)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
          MINUTE ORDER granting [18] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Reply. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss or alternatively, motion for summary judgment on or before August 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/10/2008. (VT)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Kidwell, Judith)
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
              Memorandum in opposition to re [16] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [14] MOTION to Dismiss filed by JACOB S. ADAMS, JR. (jf, )
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                MOTION (alternatively) for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (See Docket Entry [14] to view the document). (nmw, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or alternatively, motion for summary judgment no later than July 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/18/2008. (VT)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008, Terminated: 8/19/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Hardy Declaration)(Kidwell, Judith)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendant's motion to dismiss or alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/18/2008. (gdf)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 6/18/2008, (gdf)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008, Terminated: 6/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Kidwell, Judith)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Defendant's Third Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Response. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before June 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/11/2008. (VT)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set Deadlines: Answer due by 6/13/2008. (tj )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Defendant's Second Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Response. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before June 13, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/28/2008. (VT)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                    MOTION for Order directing the U.S. Marshal to effect service of summons and complaint upon the defendant by JACOB S. ADAMS, JR. "Let this be filed & denied as moot, since summons have been issued & executed" by Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle (jf, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to plaintiff's complaint due by 5/30/2008. (gdf)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Response. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before May 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/8/2008. (VT)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 3/18/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (jf, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 3/11/08. (jf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 3/10/2008, answer due 5/9/2008 (jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $14.05 be made from Prison Account of Jacob S. Adams, Jr.; further ordered, granting [2] Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/27/08. (See order for full detail)(jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                    SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                        PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JACOB S. ADAMS, JR (jf, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner StatementCourt Filing
                                                          PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/15/08. (ls, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2008: # (1) Main Document) (jf, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JACOB S. ADAMS, JR. (ls, ) (jf, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by JACOB S. ADAMS, JR.(ls, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2008: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (jf, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                                                SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (ls, )
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?