BANKS v. KRAMER et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00215-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SIMON BANKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SIMON BANKS +17052 703 965 5637 drsbanks@msn.com
v.
No Logo ANNICE WAGNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harold Hulme +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 james.hulme@arentfox.com
No Logo DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION, Defendant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo District Of Columbia Office Of Administrative Hearings, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo GARLAND PINKSTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo JOHN FERREN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
No Logo PETER NICKELS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise J. Baker +1 202 442 9887 +1 202 727 0431 denise.baker@dc.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/7/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Cases
105-cv-01514-RCL, 106-cv-00315-RCL, 107-cv-02115-DAR
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-L
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/6/2008, Entered: 9/6/2008 Large Additional Attachment(s)
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Motion to Strike DC B Foundation Motion to Dismiss Document 9 by SIMON BANKS [61] MOTION to Strike DC Bar Foundation Mot to Dismiss Amended Comp, Doc 9 filed by SIMON BANKS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(BANKS, SIMON)
    LREF
    Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Motion to Strike
    MOTION to Strike DC Bar Foundation Mot to Dismiss Amended Comp, Doc 9 by SIMON BANKS (BANKS, SIMON)
      LREF
      Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in opposition to re [58] MOTION for Reconsideration re [38] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss, AMEND COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MUKASEY MOTION for Reconsideration re [38] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss, AMEND COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MUKASEY filed by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY. (Owens, Cindy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Dkt. 9] by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Joseph)
          LREF
          Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
          MOTION for Reconsideration re [38] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss, AMEND COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MUKASEY by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(BANKS, SIMON)
            LREF
            Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
            REPLY to opposition to motion re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA COURT OF APPEALS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, GARLAND PINKSTON, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Baker, Denise)
              LREF
              Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
              REPLY to opposition to motion re [48] MOTION for Joinder of claims and to Supplement Amended Complaint against DC Bar Foundation filed by SIMON BANKS. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Plf's affidavit in support of Plf's reply to DCBAR Fd Opp to Mot for Reconsideration)(BANKS, SIMON)
                LREF
                Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [48] MOTION for Joinder of claims and to Supplement Amended Complaint against DC Bar Foundation [Defendant District of Columbia Bar Foundation's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Allegations Set Forth in the Amended Complaint as to the District of Columbia Bar Foundation as a Defendant] filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Joseph)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Memorandum
                  ENTERED IN ERROR......MEMORANDUM re [29] MOTION to Dismiss filed by NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, GARLAND PINKSTON, ANNICE WAGNER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA COURT OF APPEALS, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, JOHN FERREN by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON) Modified on 8/11/2008 (jf, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re [54] Memorandum, was entered in error and has been filed as No. [53].(jf, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 ERRATA
                      ERRATA by SIMON BANKS [51] Memorandum in Opposition filed by SIMON BANKS. (nmw, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of filing exhibits to Plf's Opp to Dist's Motion to Dismiss by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(BANKS, SIMON)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                          Memorandum in opposition to re [29] MOTION to Dismiss filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON) Modified link on 8/7/2008 (nmw, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 ERRATA
                            ERRATA to Plaintiff's Supplement to Amended Complaint against DC Bar Foundation by SIMON BANKS [9] Amended Complaint, filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                              Memorandum in opposition to re [36] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and strick all pleading filed by District of Columbia Attorney General on behalf of Kramer, Wagner, and Ferren filed by NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA COURT OF APPEALS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, GARLAND PINKSTON, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Denise)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 ~Motion for Joinder
                                MOTION for Joinder of claims and to Supplement Amended Complaint against DC Bar Foundation by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(BANKS, SIMON)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Brooks on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION (Brooks, Joseph)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [44] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION answer due 8/28/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 29, 2008. (lcrcl3, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant District of Columbia Bar Foundation Answer due by 8/28/2008. (rje)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of MICHAEL B. MUKASEY Substituting for attorney Raymond A. Martinez (Owens, Cindy)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008, Terminated: 7/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miller, Melissa)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Furrer Miller on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION (Miller, Melissa)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff"s Response due by 8/6/2008. (rje)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/23/08. (lcrcl2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [39] MOTION for Extension of Time to submit response to District Defts Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA COURT OF APPEALS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Baker, Denise)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ERRATA
                                                    ERRATA to Plaintiff's Motion for 10 day ext of time to submit response to Dist Defts Mot to Dismiss the Amended Comp by SIMON BANKS [39] MOTION for Extension of Time to submit response to District Defts Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to submit response to District Defts Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by SIMON BANKS (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [30] Motion for Extension of Time to effect service; denying [32] Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint; denying [34] Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint; denying [37] Motion for Default Judgment; granting [12] Motion to Dismiss with respect to defendant Attorney General Mukasey. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/18/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                          MOTION for Default Judgment as to by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plf's Motion to Strike all pleadings filed by the Attorney General for the District of Columbia on Behalf of Defendants Kramer, Wagner, and Ferren and to Disqualify the Attorney General from representring conflicting interest of Kramer, Wagner, Ferren, Nic)(BANKS, SIMON)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                            MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and strick all pleading filed by District of Columbia Attorney General on behalf of Kramer, Wagner, and Ferren by SIMON BANKS (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Notice of QC
                                                              NOTICE re [35] Notice (Other); emailed to drsbanks@msn.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Party is directed to refile his pleading using the proper ECF event to file a return of service. (tg, ) Modified to edit text on 7/11/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Service of Process upon DC Bar Foundation by SIMON BANKS (BANKS, SIMON) Modified on 7/10/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct Comp. against Michael B. Mukasey by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit App. Amdd Pet for Rhrg En Banc, # (2) Exhibit Plf convening hearing as an administrative law judge, DC COHR, # (3) Exhibit NEW LTR REFERRING TO PLF'S SUCCESSOR NEIL ALEXANDER AS ALJ, JUDGE IN TRIBUTE)(BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 ERRATA
                                                                    ERRATA to Motion to Amend Comp. as to DC Bar Foundation by SIMON BANKS [32] MOTION to Amend/Correct [9] Amended Complaint, filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct [9] Amended Complaint, by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON) Modified to correct linkage on 7/8/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to by SIMON BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email to Katherine Garrett, registered agent)(BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA COURT OF APPEALS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, GARLAND PINKSTON, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order DCCA ORDER, # (2) Text of Proposed Order DCOAH ORDER, # (3) Text of Proposed Order DISTRICT ORDER, # (4) Text of Proposed Order FERREN ORDER, # (5) Text of Proposed Order KRAMER ORDER, # (6) Text of Proposed Order NICKLES ORDER, # (7) Text of Proposed Order PINKSTON ORDER, # (8) Text of Proposed Order WAGNER ORDER)(Baker, Denise)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/29/2008, Entered: 6/29/2008 Surreply
                                                                              Supplemental SURREPLY re [8] MOTION to Dismiss (BANKS, SIMON) Modified to edilt text on 6/30/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/28/2008, Entered: 6/28/2008 Surreply
                                                                                SURREPLY to CCE REPLY TO PLF'S OPP TO [8] MT TO DISMIS filed by SIMON BANKS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit MSPB DECISION RE RUFUS GILLETTE, 2003, # (2) Exhibit EEOC HRG PROCEEDINGS RE VERA MILLER 2003-2004, # (3) Exhibit EEOC PROCEEDINGS RE ANTHONY HOLT, # (4) Exhibit MSPB PROCEEDINGS RE DAVID COHEN, # (5) Exhibit DC OHR DECISION RE DAVID COLLN)(BANKS, SIMON) Modified to add linkage on 6/30/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying [17], [18], [19] Motions for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss; granting [20] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/27/2008. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition due by 7/1/2008. Plaintiff's Time to effectuate service upon party due by 7/1/2008. (rje)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Bulk Exhibits by SIMON BANKS re [12] MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Case, Augustine v. Dept of Vet. Affairs, # (2) Exhibit Simon Banks, ALJ, convening hearing befor DC CHR, # (3) Exhibit Case, Theodore Yanopoulos v. Dept of Navy)(BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hulme, James)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Notice of QC
                                                                                          NOTICE re [23] Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to drsbanks@msn.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Please refile document, 3. Plaintiff is directed to file the correct document. (tg, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON) Modified on 7/14/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff shall have until June 16, 2008, to submit his reponse to defendant's motion to dismiss amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/16/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/14/2008, Entered: 6/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SIMON BANKS. (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to response to Mukasey's motion to dismiss complaint by SIMON BANKS (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to effect service of process on remaining defendants by SIMON BANKS (BANKS, SIMON)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                      MOTION for a 2-Day Extension of Time to Submit Response to Defendant Council for Court Excellence Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by SIMON BANKS (tg, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [6] Motion for ECF password. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/30/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/30/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER requiring plaintiff to file proof of service or status memorandum within 10 days. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/30/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER advising plaintiff that he must respond to defendants' dispositive motions within 14 days. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/30/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant District of Columbia Answer or otherwise response due by 7/7/2008. (rje)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service upon party or status memorandum due by 6/9/2008. (rje)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Responsedue by 6/13/2008. (rje)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Response to the Council for Court Excellence Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. by SIMON BANKS (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 6/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Response to the Council for Court Excellence Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by SIMON BANKS (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Chief Judge Royce C. Lambert
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Martinez, Raymond)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Errata re Plaintiff's Filings by SIMON BANKS (tg, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE Praecipe by COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE re [9] Amended Complaint, (Hulme, James)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA COURT OF APPEALS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BAR FOUNDATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, GARLAND PINKSTON, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY filed by SIMON BANKS.(tg, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hulme, James)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [5] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to complaint filed by SIMON BANKS. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for CM/ECF Password and Authority to Participate in ECF Filings by SIMON BANKS (tg, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Denise)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANNICE WAGNER served on 4/14/2008, answer due 5/5/2008 (tg, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 4/10/2008. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER served on 4/9/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; JOHN FERREN served on 4/9/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; GARLAND PINKSTON served on 4/9/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; PETER NICKELS served on 4/9/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE served on 4/10/2008, answer due 4/30/2008 (tg, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SIMON BANKS. Case related to Case No. 05-1514, 06-315 and 07-2115. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, GARLAND PINKSTON, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010061) filed by SIMON BANKS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) Modified to add missing page on 3/6/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                  Summons (9) Issued as to NOEL ANKETELL KRAMER, ANNICE WAGNER, JOHN FERREN, GARLAND PINKSTON, PETER NICKELS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, COUNCIL FOR COURT EXCELLENCE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 262 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?