CHARLTON v. WYNNE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00221-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOHN PAUL CHARLTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF DAVID P. SHELDON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Patrick Sheldon +1 202 546 9575 +1 202 546 0135 davidsheldon@davidsheldonlaw.com
v.
No Logo MICHAEL W. WYNNE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/8/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION granting in part and denying without prejudice in part defendant's motion for summary judgment 18 , and denying in part and denying without prejudice in part plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment 25 . The decision of the AFBCMR is remanded to the agency for further consideration in accordance with Part III(H) of this Opinion. An Order consistent with this Opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 5, 2012. (lcplf1)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
    REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL W. WYNNE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Kidwell, Judith)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to response to defendant's mtoion to dismiss due by 9/3/2008. (mm)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
        MINUTE ORDER granting [8] defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including September 3, 2008 to file his reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 20, 2008. (MA)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MICHAEL W. WYNNE (Kidwell, Judith)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
            Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN PAUL CHARLTON. (Sheldon, David)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 8/12/2008. (mm)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                MINUTE ORDER granting [6] plaintiff's second consent motion for extension of time up to and including August 12, 2008 to file opposition in response to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 11, 2008. (MA)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by JOHN PAUL CHARLTON (Sheldon, David)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/10/2008. (tth)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Notice of QC
                      NOTICE re [5] Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to davidsheldon@militarydefense.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The document was scanned sideways. In the future, please scan document properly. (ztd, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                        MINUTE ORDER granting [5] plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time up to and including July 10, 2008 to file opposition in response to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 4, 2008. (MA)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by JOHN PAUL CHARLTON (Sheldon, David)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL W. WYNNE (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Kidwell, Judith)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/30/2008. (mm)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                MINUTE ORDER granting [3] defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including May 30, 2008 to answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 23, 2008. (MA)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 4/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by MICHAEL W. WYNNE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of MICHAEL W. WYNNE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against MICHAEL W. WYNNE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010149) filed by JOHN PAUL CHARLTON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Summons Issued
                                        Summons (3) Issued as to MICHAEL W. WYNNE., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?