MOORE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00223-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NOAH MOORE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/11/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Substitution of Counsel
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Raymond A. Martinez (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/8/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 LetterCourt Filing
    Letter from Noah Moore. "Granted, nunc pro tunc" Judge Emmet G. Sullivan (jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Martinez, Raymond)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NOAH MOORE. (jf, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/20/2008. (clv, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
            Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion [8] for summary judgment or the Court may deem the matter conceded. Plaintiff's response is due 5/20/2008. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/15/08. (EHS)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2 affadavit of christine green, # (3) Exhibit 3 feb8, 2007 letter, # (4) Exhibit 4 Plaintiff's Letter, # (5) Exhibit 5 BOP Letter To Plaintiff, # (6) Exhibit 6; Plaintiff appeal letter dated April 27, 2007, # (7) Exhibit 7 Agency letter to plaintiff dated May 18, 2007, # (8) Exhibit 8 Agency decision letter dated june 23,2007, # (9) Exhibit 9 Plaintiff request for reconsideration letter dated July 18, 2007)(Martinez, Raymond)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/14/2008. (clv, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's [7] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its answer or motion shall be filed by April 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/10/08. (ms, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affadavit of Roy Lathrup)(Martinez, Raymond)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 2/19/08., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 2/12/2008, answer due 4/14/2008 (jf, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond A. Martinez on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Martinez, Raymond)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                          ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $60.05 be made from Prison Account of Noah Moore; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/05/08. (jf, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                            PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by NOAH MOORE (jf, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 2/11/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NOAH MOORE (jf, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by NOAH MOORE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                  SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?