LUKENS v. RICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00243-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STEVEN D. LUKENS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Rudolph A. Kleysteuber +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 rudy.kleysteuber@ropesgray.com
Space James Eric Hopenfeld +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 james.hopenfeld@ropesgray.com
Space Stuart W. Yothers +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 stuart.yothers@ropesgray.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/13/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held in open Court on August 28, 2008, it is hereby ORDERED: fact discovery shall be completed no later than January 30, 2009; each party's designation of experts and reports shall be made no later March 2, 2009; rebuttal expert reports shall be served no later than April 1, 2009; expert discovery, including expert witness depositions, shall conclude no later than May 1, 2009; dispositive motions shall be filed no later than June 1, 2009; oppositions shall be filed no later than July 1, 2009; and replies shall be filed no later than July 16, 2009. No pre-trial conference or trial date is scheduled at this time. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 09/02/08. (lcrmc1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2009. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2009. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2009. Status Conference set for 2/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas P. Cartier on behalf of CONDOLEEZZA RICE (Cartier, Nicholas)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Scheduling Conference
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/2008. A Scheduling Order will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Notice of Hearing.
          NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 8/28/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Hopenfeld, James)
              LREF
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference. An Initial Scheduling Conference in this case is set for August 22, 2008 at 11:30 a.m. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 07/16/08. (lcrmc1)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2, main building, 2nd floor, before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                  ANSWER to [16] Amended Complaint by CONDOLEEZZA RICE. Related document: [16] Amended Complaint filed by STEVEN D. LUKENS.(Phillips, Heather)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order
                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER vacating the Minute Entry Order, filed on May 29, 2008, setting a briefing schedule regarding [11] Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Court's [17] Order accepting Defendant's withdrawal of her [11] Partial Motion to Dismiss the original Complaint as moot, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's Minute Entry Order, filed on May 29, 2008, setting a briefing schedule regarding [11] Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss [11] is VACATED. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/17/08. (lcrmc1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER: because Plaintiff has filed his First Amended Complaint, and in view of the fact that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint omits Counts Two-Four of his original Complaint respecting claims under the APA and the U.S. Constitution, Defendant's motion to dismiss those claims, see Docket No. 11, is moot and hereby withdrawn, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/12/08. (tth,)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Amended Complaint
                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CONDOLEEZZA RICE filed by STEVEN D. LUKENS.(nmw, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hopenfeld, James)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION to withdraw MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Counts Two, Three, and Four by STEVEN D. LUKENS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hopenfeld, James)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Counts Two, Three, and Four by STEVEN D. LUKENS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to [11] due by 6/11/2008. (cdw)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [13] Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response to [11] Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss no later than June 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/09/08. (lcrmc1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Memorandum due by 6/9/2008. Defendant's Reply due by 6/18/2008. (cdw)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      VACATED per court order entered 6/17/2008.....MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [12] Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall files his Memorandum of Opposing Points and Authorities no later than June 9, 2008; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant may file her Reply Memorandum no later than June 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 05/29/08. (lcrmc1) Modified on 6/18/2008 (tg, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Joint MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss by STEVEN D. LUKENS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008, Terminated: 6/13/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                          WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 6/12/08..... MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Counts Two, Three, and Four by CONDOLEEZZA RICE (Phillips, Heather) Modified on 6/13/2008 (tth, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [10] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney W. Rudolph A. Kleysteuber IV is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 04/18/08. (lcrmc1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [9] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stuart W. Yothers is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 04/18/08.(lcrmc1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008, Terminated: 4/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William R. Kleysteuber, :Firm- Ropes & Gray, :Address- 700 12th Street NW Washington DC 20005. Phone No. - 202 508-4600. Fax No. - 202 508 4650 by STEVEN D. LUKENS (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008, Terminated: 4/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stuart W Yothers, :Firm- Ropes & Gray, :Address- 1211 Avenue of Americas New York NY 10036. Phone No. - 212 596-9000. Fax No. - 212 596-9090 by STEVEN D. LUKENS (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [6] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than May 21, 2008. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition to [7] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time is STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 04/17/08. (lcrmc1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 5/21/2008. (cdw)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                        STRICKEN pursuant to Order entered 4/17/2008.....Memorandum in opposition to re [6] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by STEVEN D. LUKENS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A DOJ website printout, # (2) Exhibit B Proposed order, # (3) Exhibit C Stuart Yothers Declaration)(Hopenfeld, James) Modified on 4/18/2008 (tg, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 4/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CONDOLEEZZA RICE (Phillips, Heather)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 ERRATA
                                                            ERRATA by STEVEN D. LUKENS [3] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC, [4] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [2] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by STEVEN D. LUKENS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE served on 2/20/2008, answer due 4/21/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. STEVEN D. LUKENS served on 2/20/2008, answer due 4/21/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 2/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(Hopenfeld, James)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against CONDOLEEZZA RICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010241) filed by STEVEN D. LUKENS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                      Summons (3) Issued as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 294 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?