HARRIS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00238-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo OTIS HARRIS, III, Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/13/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 4/21/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
ORDER denying as moot [8] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting [9] Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw the Complaint, and dismissing the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/17/08.(ah)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Motion to Withdraw
    MOTION to Withdraw [1] Complaint by OTIS HARRIS, III (jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008, Terminated: 4/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Kidwell, Judith)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 2/19/08. (jf, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
              ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made in the amount of $5.70, from Prison Account of Otis Harris III; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/05/08. (jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by OTIS HARRIS, III (jf, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by OTIS HARRIS, III (jf, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by OTIS HARRIS, III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                      SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 105 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?