MILTON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00242-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GREGORY A. MILTON, Plaintiff
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/13/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying the plaintiff's motion 38 for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/31/2012. (lcrwr1)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/8/2012. (lcrwr1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
      MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion [14] for time through August 11, 2008 to file a response to the defendant's dispositive motion be, and hereby is, GRANTED, nunc pro tunc. A response is due 8/11/2008. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/3/08. (EHS)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [11] MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment by GREGORY A. MILTON (jf, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2008. (lin, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion [13] for time through July 14, 2008 to file a response to the motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 07/02/08. (EHS)
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
              MOTION for Extension of Time to response to motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment by GREGORY A. MILTON. (jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                Order advising plaintiff to respond to the defendant's motion [11] to dismiss or for summary judgment, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. Response is due 6/16/2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 05/07/08. (EHS)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/16/2008 (zlin, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (letters from BOP to Plaintiff), # (2) Exhibit B (Declaration of Vanessa Herbin-Smith, with its own exhibits), # (3) Exhibit C (BOP Program Statement, Section 9), # (4) Exhibit D (Memorandum Opinion from McMillian v. BOP))(Natiello, Christian)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/5/2008, (lin, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                        MINUTE ORDER (paperless): It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion [10] for time through May 5, 2008 to respond to the complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 04/24/08. (EHS)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008, Terminated: 4/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (jf, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 2/19/08. (jf, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [3] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying [3] Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/8/08. (jf, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $41.50 be made from Prison Account of Gregory A. Milton; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/8/08. (jf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                    PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by GREGORY A. MILTON (jf, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Supplemental Memorandum
                                      MEMORANDUM to re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GREGORY A. MILTON. (jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by GREGORY A. MILTON (jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY A. MILTON (jf, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by GREGORY A. MILTON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                              SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?