ANGUS, INC v. SCHAFER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00266-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Angus Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo ED SCHAFER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/15/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 891 - Agriculture Acts
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 11001
Terminated 7/30/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-C
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/29/08. (mpt, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Stipulation
    Joint STIPULATION for settlement by ANGUS, INC, ED SCHAFER. (td, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 ~Motion for Settlement
      Joint MOTION for Settlement /Stipulation of Dismissal by ANGUS, INC, ED SCHAFER (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [5] Joint MOTION for Settlement /Stipulation of Dismissal was entered in error and refiled using the correct event as document no. 6.(td, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Answer
          ANSWER to [1] Complaint by ED SCHAFER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by ANGUS, INC.(Natiello, Christian)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of ED SCHAFER (Natiello, Christian)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
              SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANGUS, INC identifying Corporate Parent NONE for ANGUS, INC. (td, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against ED SCHAFER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010343) filed by ANGUS, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Summons Issued
                    Summons (1) Issued as to ED SCHAFER. (td, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 118 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?