OLIVER v. CHERTOFF
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00288-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RENEE OLIVER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Branch +1 202 785 2805 +1 202 785 0289 dablaw@erols.com
v.
Chertoff, Michael Chertoff, Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL CHERTOFF"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/20/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
MEET AND CONFER ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/18/2008. (lcrcl1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Answer
    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by MICHAEL CHERTOFF. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by RENEE OLIVER.(Natiello, Christian)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer or otherwise response due by 8/14/2008. (rje)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 14, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/16/2008. (lcrcl1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008, Terminated: 7/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by MICHAEL CHERTOFF (Natiello, Christian)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Branch, David)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MICHAEL CHERTOFF served on 5/12/2008, answer due 7/11/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Branch, David)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 5/5/08. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of David A. Branch)(Branch, David)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of MICHAEL CHERTOFF (Natiello, Christian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against MICHAEL CHERTOFF ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010400) filed by RENEE OLIVER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dot, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                      SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MICHAEL CHERTOFF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dot, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 73 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?