MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00270-JDB
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michelin North America, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Joseph Fitzgibbon +1 202 712 2812 +1 202 712 2860 tim.fitzgibbon@nelsonmullins.com
v.
No Logo Defense Logistics Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo M. SUSAN CHADICK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/19/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 5/22/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-C
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES, M. SUSAN CHADICK. (Natiello, Christian)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
    MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [4] the consent motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by not later than May 28, 2008. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE answer due 5/28/2008; DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY answer due 5/28/2008; ROBERT M. GATES answer due 5/28/2008; M. SUSAN CHADICK answer due 5/28/2008. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/29/2008. (lcjdb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008, Terminated: 4/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES, M. SUSAN CHADICK (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES, M. SUSAN CHADICK (Natiello, Christian)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
          SUMMONS (6) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES, M. SUSAN CHADICK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
            LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie Generale Des Establissements Michelin (CGEM) for. (lc, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES, M. SUSAN CHADICK ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010371) filed by MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Summons Not Issued
                SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES, M. SUSAN CHADICK (lc, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 127 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?