APPLIN v. WINTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00334-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SEILA APPLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com
v.
No Logo DONALD C. WINTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/26/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment...Granted with respect to retaliation claim and Denied as to discrimination claim. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2012 at 9:30am at the US Courthouse, Washington, DC.. Signed by Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 3/15/2012. (Scullin, Frederick)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Answer
    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by DONALD C. WINTER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by SEILA APPLIN.(Natiello, Christian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part [6] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 11, 2008. (NP)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Notice of Hearing.
        NOTICE: Motion hearing currently scheduled for Thursday, July 10, 2008 @ 11:30am is now CANCELED. (tj )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion To Dismiss : Motion Hearing is set for 7/10/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. *NOTE: Parties will be allowed 10 minutes per side for oral argument*(tj )
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
            REPLY to opposition to motion re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by DONALD C. WINTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Natiello, Christian)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
              MINUTE ORDER granting [9] Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 9, 2008. (NP)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by SEILA APPLIN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rucker, Donna)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                  Memorandum in opposition to re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by SEILA APPLIN. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rucker, Donna)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                    MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [7] Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss because plaintiff did not confer with opposing counsel as required by Local Civil Rule 7(m). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 4, 2008. (NP)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by SEILA APPLIN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rucker, Donna)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD C. WINTER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B, and C)(Natiello, Christian)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DONALD C. WINTER served on 3/25/2008, answer due 5/27/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Rucker, Donna)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. DONALD C. WINTER served on 3/20/2008, answer due 5/19/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Rucker, Donna)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General March 20, 2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Rucker, Donna)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of DONALD C. WINTER (Natiello, Christian)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against DONALD C. WINTER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010567) filed by SEILA APPLIN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mmh, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                    SUMMONS (3)Issued as to DONALD C. WINTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mmh, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 916 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?