NAKAMURA v. HAYDEN
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00354-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KOUICHI NAKAMURA, Plaintiff
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/27/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 99999
Terminated 8/28/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-I
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting as conceded defendant's [12] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/28/08. (ms, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
    Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment by 8/15/2008, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/9/08. (ms, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2008. (dot, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit A thru J)(Kidwell, Judith)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
          MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's [11] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and the Answer or other response to the complaint is due by 6/6/2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/29/08. (ms, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Kidwell, Judith)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
              Summons Returned Unexecuted as to MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (td, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/30/2008. (dot, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's [9] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and the Answer or other response to the complaint shall be filed by 5/30/2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/8/08. (ms, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Kidwell, Judith)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on March 26, 2008. (SM)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Summons Reissued
                          SUMMONS REISSUED (1) as to MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (td, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                            Summons Returned Unexecuted as to MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 3/3/08. (td, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008 (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/27/08. (td, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KOUICHI NAKAMURA (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against MICHAEL V. HAYDEN filed by KOUICHI NAKAMURA. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                        SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Memorandum and Opinion
                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/27/08. (See Docket Entry [3] to view document)(td, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?