FOLKS v. COHEN et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00349-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY S. FOLKS, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ADAM COHEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo HOWARD B. KATZOFF, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CARR MALONEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis John Quinn +1 202 310 5519 +1 202 310 5555 djq@carrmaloney.com
No Logo KENNETH WAINSTEIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo PROBATION DEPARTMENT, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/27/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Responses due by 8/18/2008. (dot, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
    MINUTE ORDER denying [23] Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, inasmuch as a default has not been entered against any defendant and the record does not show that any defendant is in default; granting nunc pro tunc [24] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; granting [26] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to defendants' dispositive motions within 60 days. Plaintiff shall file his responses to the two separately filed motions by August 18, 2008 or, as previously advised, risk dismissal of the complaint against the respective movant(s), or the entire case, on conceded motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/12/08. (ah, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
      MOTION for Extension of Time to to answer the defendants' motion to dismiss by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [23] MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by HOWARD B. KATZOFF. (Quinn, Dennis)
          LREF
          Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
          MOTION for Extension of Time by ANTHONY S. FOLKS. "Leave to filed Motion granted" by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (jf, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Notice of QC
            NOTICE re [23] Motion for Default Judgment; emailed to tawana_davis@dcd.uscourts.gov, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document not complete/legible, 2. JUST TESTING THE NOTICE TO TAWANA AND KATHY (nmw, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
              MOTION for Default Judgment by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Mail Returned
                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony S. Folks, P.O. Box 1000, Lewisburg, PA 17837. (dot, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                  Order advising plaintiff to respond to the federal defendants' motion to dismiss by June 16, 2008 or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against the movants or in its entirety. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/12/08. (ah)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 6/16/2008. (dot, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss by ADAM COHEN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KENNETH WAINSTEIN (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of ADAM COHEN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KENNETH WAINSTEIN (Kidwell, Judith)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [16] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to dispositive motion; denying [16] Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/8/08.(ah)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008, Terminated: 5/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to answer defendants motion to dismiss`, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                NOTICE of Change of Address by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                  Order advising plaintiff to respond by May 12, 2008, to Defendant Katzoff's motion to dismiss or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against the movant. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/7/08. (ah)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/12/2008. (dot, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss by HOWARD B. KATZOFF (Quinn, Dennis)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis John Quinn on behalf of HOWARD B. KATZOFF (Quinn, Dennis)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on March 26, 2008. (SM)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 3/11/08. (td, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed upon Howard B. Katzoff served 3/10/08; answer due 5/9/2008. (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/11/2008, answer due 3/31/2008. (td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to Probation Department served 3/10/08; answer due 05/09/2008 (td, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to Adam Cohen served 3/10/08; answer due 05/09/2008 (td, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 3/10/2008, answer due 5/9/2008 (td, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                        SUMMONS (6) Issued as to ADAM COHEN, HOWARD B. KATZOFF, PROBATION DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, U.S. Attorney (td, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/27/08. (td, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                            PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY S. FOLKS (td, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against ADAM COHEN, HOWARD B. KATZOFF, PROBATION DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KENNETH WAINSTEIN filed by ANTHONY S. FOLKS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                                                  SUMMONS Not Issued as to ADAM COHEN, HOWARD B. KATZOFF, PROBATION DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, KENNETH WAINSTEIN (td, )
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?