SCINTO v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00361-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PAUL SCINTO, SR., Plaintiff
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo HARLEY G. LAPPIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo KIM M. WHITE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo PATRICIA STANSBERRY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo R. HOLT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/28/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-F
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Waiver of Insufficient Service Based on Having Been Served at a Business Addresses Rather Than Service at Their Home Addresses by PATRICIA STANSBERRY, SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, R. HOLT (Natiello, Christian)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Summons Reissued
    SUMMONS (2) REISSUED as to PATRICIA STANSBERRY at FCC Petersburg, P.O. Box 90026, Petersburg, VA 23804, R. HOLT at FCI Butner Low/Camp, P.O. Box 1000, Butner, NC 27509-1000. ("Granted" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MINUTE ORDER granting as unopposed plaintiff's [16] motion to ascertain the residence addresses of defendants Stansberry, McClintock and Holt, employees of the Bureau of Prisons. See Local Civil Rule 7(b). These defendants have been sued in their individual capacity as well as their official capacity. Defendants' counsel is directed to either (1) provide their residential addresses to plaintiff so that he may effect proper service of process, or (2) represent that these defendants are waiving any motions to dismiss based on improper service of process by virtue of their having been served at a business address rather than a residential address. See Motion to Dismiss at 10 n.6. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/11/08. (lcplf1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Reply to Document
        REPLY re [13] MOTION to Dismiss or to Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by PAUL SCINTO, SR. (td, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION to Transfer Case, [13] MOTION to Dismiss or to Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KIM M. WHITE, PATRICIA STANSBERRY, SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, R. HOLT. (Natiello, Christian)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Supplemental Memorandum
            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [18] Response & Objections to defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer to the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by PAUL SCINTO, SR. (td, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, to transfer due by 6/20/2008. (mm)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                MINUTE ORDER granting [17] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative to Transfer. Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before June 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/30/08. (lcplf1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Response to Document
                  RESPONSE re [13] MOTION to Dismiss or to Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by PAUL SCINTO, SR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(td, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    MOTION to ascertain the residence address of defendants Patricia Stansberry, Susan G. Mcclintock and Richard Holt, Jr. (R. Holt) Employees of the Federal Bureau of Prisons by PAUL SCINTO, SR (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                      MOTION for 20 day Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer to the Eastern District of North Carolina by PAUL SCINTO, SR (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER that the plaintiff must respond to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before May 28, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 14, 2008. (MA)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 5/28/2008. (mm)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
                            MOTION to Transfer Case by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KIM M. WHITE, PATRICIA STANSBERRY, SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, R. HOLT; (See Docket Entry [13] to view document) (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss or to Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KIM M. WHITE, PATRICIA STANSBERRY, SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, R. HOLT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Declaration of James R. Schluter, # (2) Exhibit B, Caseloads for Districts of D.C. and N.C.)(Natiello, Christian)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by PAUL SCINTO, SR re [2] MOTION to ascertain the whereabouts of defendant R. Holt an employee, or former employee, of the Federal Bureau of Prisons (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to R. HOLT served on 4/11/2008, answer due 6/10/2008. (td, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK served on 3/11/2008, answer due 5/12/2008. (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 3/10/08. (td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 3/10/2008, answer due 5/9/2008. (td, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PATRICIA STANSBERRY served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (td, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to KIM M. WHITE served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (td, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to HARLEY G. LAPPIN served on 3/10/2008, answer due 5/9/2008. (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 3/10/2008, answer due 5/9/2008. (td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                  Summons Returned Unexecuted by PAUL SCINTO, SR as to SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK. (td, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Reissued
                                                    SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK (td, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION to ascertain the whereabouts of defendant R. Holt an employee, or former employee, of the Federal Bureau of Prisons by PAUL SCINTO, SR (td, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KIM M. WHITE, PATRICIA STANSBERRY, SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, R. HOLT ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010602) filed by PAUL SCINTO, SR. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Summons Issued
                                                          Summons (8) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, KIM M. WHITE, PATRICIA STANSBERRY, SUSAN G. MCCLINTOCK, R. HOLT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 255 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?