MOGENHAN v. PEAKE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00391-GK
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANN M. MOGENHAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Myrrel C. Hendricks +1 202 577 8909 myrrelh@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo JAMES B. PEAKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/4/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
106-cv-02041-GK
Related Case
106-cv-02041-GK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CONSOL, JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Notice of QC
NOTICE re [10] Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to christian.natiello@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel is reminded to file all documents or pleadings in Lead case 06-CV-2041 Only (tr, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
    ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re (34 in 1:06-cv-02041-GK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMES B. PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-02041-GK, 1:08-cv-00391-GK(Natiello, Christian) Modified on 7/16/2008 (tr).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Notice of QC
      NOTICE re [9] Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to myrrelh@yahoo.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel is reminded to file all documents in Lead case 06-CV-2041 Only (tr, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re (34 in 1:06-cv-02041-GK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-02041-GK, 1:08-cv-00391-GK(Hendricks, Myrrel) Modified on 7/3/2008 (tr)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Create Case Association
          Cases Consolidated. Pursuant to Court Order entered 6/18/2008 this case has been consolidated with case number 06-2041. ALL PLEADINGS IN CASE NUMBER 08-391 SHALL BE FILED FROM NOW ON IN THE LEAD CASE NUMBER 06-2041 ONLY. (tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008, Terminated: 5/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JAMES B. PEAKE (Natiello, Christian)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/20/2008, (CL, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer JAMES B. PEAKE answer due 6/20/2008.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/5/08. (CL, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  MINUTE ORDER denying [7] the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to comply with LCivR 7(c). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/5/08. (CL, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008, Terminated: 5/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JAMES B. PEAKE (Natiello, Christian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of JAMES B. PEAKE (Natiello, Christian)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. JAMES B. PEAKE served on 3/4/2008, answer due 5/5/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 03/06/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JAMES B. PEAKE served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Notice of Related Case
                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANN M. MOGENHAN. Case related to Case No. 06-2041. (mmh, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against JAMES B PEAKE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010655) filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mmh, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                  SUMMONS Not Issued as to JAMES B PEAKE (mmh, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?