MURRELL v. PRESTON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00401-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SALLY MURRELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF, LERNER, SIMON & SALMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Salzman +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 salzman@hellerhuron.com
v.
No Logo STEVEN C. PRESTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/5/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Order on Motion for MediationCourt Filing
ORDER granting [12] Joint Motion to Refer Case to Mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/5/08. (lcrcl2, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008, Terminated: 9/5/2008 Motion for Mediation
    Joint MOTION for Mediation and to Stay Discovery by SALLY MURRELL (Salzman, Richard)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/27/2008. (lcrcl2, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosures due by 7/11/2008. Discovery due by 12/24/2008. Expert depositions due by 2/7/2009. Summary Judgment motions due by 2/22/2009. Oppositions due by 3/24/2009. Replies due by 4/8/2009. (rje)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Notice of Proposed Order
          NOTICE of Proposed Order for Case Schedule by SALLY MURRELL re [9] Meet and Confer Statement (Salzman, Richard)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Salzman, Richard)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Report with Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/3/2008. (rje)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER requiring parties to meet and confer and jointly submit a written report and proposed scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/04/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/04/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Answer
                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by STEVEN C. PRESTON. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by SALLY MURRELL.(Kidwell, Judith)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by STEVEN C. PRESTON (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of STEVEN C. PRESTON (Kidwell, Judith)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 03-10-2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. STEVEN C. PRESTON served on 3/10/2008, answer due 5/9/2008 (Salzman, Richard)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to STEVEN C. PRESTON served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (Salzman, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against STEVEN C. PRESTON ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010708) filed by SALLY MURRELL. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Summons Issued
                                Summons (3) Issued as to STEVEN C. PRESTON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tg, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?